United States of America v. Schaal et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Dwaine Schaal, Dwaine A. Schaal, Terry A. Schaal and McHenry County, Illinois
Case Number: 1:2019cv01033
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:The joint motion #12 to stay is granted in part, and on conditions. The answer deadline of 04/01/2019 is extended to 06/03/2019. But the parties must file a status report on 05/06/2019, stating what progress has been made on completing the tax returns (as the stay motion represents is the plan), and if prepared, the status of the government's review. If there is good cause for another extension, then another extension motion may be filed, but by late 05/2019, the Court would expect significant progress on resolving the case. The status hearing of 04/04/2019 is reset to 06/17/2019 at 9:30 AM.Emailed notice (slb, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 STATUS Report (Joint Initial Status Report) by United States of America (Sarnell, Bradley)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Bradley Alexander Sarnell for presentment of motion to stay #12 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 4/4/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Sarnell, Bradley)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America to stay Joint Motion to Stay Case (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Sarnell, Bradley)
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The Schaal Defendants' unopposed extension motion #9 to answer or respond to the complaint is granted to 04/01/2019. Emailed notice (slb, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Michael L Raff for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #9 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 3/25/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Raff, Michael)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants Dwaine Schaal, Terry A. Schaal for extension of time to file answer (Raff, Michael)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Dwaine Schaal, Terry A. Schaal by Michael L Raff (Raff, Michael)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION Regarding Defendant McHenry County, Illinois's Involvement In The Case (Sarnell, Bradley)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant McHenry County, Illinois by Jana E. Blake Dickson (Blake Dickson, Jana)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 04/04/2019 at 10:30 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
February 19, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Dwaine Schaal (mc, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
February 15, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants McHenry County, Illinois, Terry A. Schaal (jjr, )
February 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Bradley Alexander Sarnell (Sarnell, Bradley)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sarnell, Bradley)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America; (Sarnell, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Schaal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwaine Schaal
Represented By: Michael L Raff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwaine A. Schaal
Represented By: Michael L Raff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry A. Schaal
Represented By: Michael L Raff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McHenry County, Illinois
Represented By: Jana E. Blake Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Bradley Alexander Sarnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?