Gomez v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Ramona Gomez
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv01087
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: M David Weisman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable M. David Weisman: This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Weisman. Parties are directed to follow the briefing schedule set forth in Local Rule 16.4. Mailed notice (ao,)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable M. David Weisman pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceeding parting having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/20/2019. (yap, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Joint Consent having been filed, status hearing set for 4/18/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice. (etv, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Spector, Deborah)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Nigel B Cooney as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill (Cooney, Nigel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing set for 4/18/2019 at 09:00 AM, courtroom 2141. Parties are encouraged to consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge for all purposes. Mailed notice. (etv, )
February 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ramona Gomez by Justin Roger Poh (Poh, Justin)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ramona Gomez by Joseph Stephen Sellers (Sellers, Joseph)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ramona Gomez by Deborah Susan Spector (Spector, Deborah)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Spector, Deborah)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Ramona Gomez; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15490293.(Spector, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Nigel B Cooney
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Gomez
Represented By: Joseph Stephen Sellers
Represented By: Justin Roger Poh
Represented By: Deborah Susan Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?