The United States of America v. Norwood et al

Plaintiff: The United States of America
Defendant: Moor Money Accounting, Inc. and Courtney Norwood
Case Number: 1:2019cv01238
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 PRO SE Appearance by Defendants Moor Money Accounting, Inc., Courtney Norwood (ek, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 5/15/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant appeared late and after the case was called for a status. For the reasons stated on the record, a Rule 55(a) default is entered as to Defendants Courtney Norwood and Moor Money Accounting, Inc. If any Defendants file an appearance on or before 5/2/2019, the Court will vacate the default as to that Defendant. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS Report by The United States of America (Stallings, Mary)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The United States of America as to Moor Money Accounting, Inc. on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Stallings, Mary)
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The United States of America as to Courtney Norwood on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Stallings, Mary)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At Plaintiff's request, the status hearing set for 3/21/2019 #3 is stricken and re-set for 4/11/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 3/21/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
February 19, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Moor Money Accounting, Inc., Courtney Norwood (mc, )
February 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by The United States of America; (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stallings, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America v. Norwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America
Represented By: Mary A. Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moor Money Accounting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?