Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 107.138.59.188 and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv01243
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo:This case is hereby dismissed without prejudice pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice #9 filed by Plaintiff on 4/5/19. (rao, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF JOHN DOE (Smith, Marc)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: After a careful review of this recently filed lawsuit, Plaintiff's counsel is authorized to proceed with expedited discovery and issue subpoenas to determine the identity of the Doe defendant. In the meantime, Plaintiff's Doe complaint is dismissed without prejudice to the filing of a proper amended complaint which expressly names the defendant. All discovery and third party subpoenas must be complied with even though the pending complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 2/25/2019. Mailed notice(jh, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (jh, )
February 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re notification of affiliates pursuant to local rule 3.2 #4 NOTICE OF FILING (Smith, Marc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re attorney appearance #3 , civil cover sheet #2 , complaint #1 NOTIFICATION OF AFFILIATES FRCP 7.1 AND LR 3.2 DISCLOSURE (Smith, Marc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC by Marc Craig Smith ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (Smith, Marc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Marc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT COMPLAINT-ACTION FOR DAMAGES FOR PROPERTY RIGHTS INFRINGEMENT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15499930. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 107.138.59.188
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Marc Craig Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?