Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe subscriber assigned IP address 107.201.57.238

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 107.201.57.238
Case Number: 1:2019cv01246
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 16 MAILED Copyright report with certified copy of minute order dated 4/8/2019 #15 to Register of Copyrights, Washington, D.C. (sxb, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to notice of voluntary dismissal, this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. The 4/30/2019 status hearing is stricken.Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (srn, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF JOHN DOE (Smith, Marc)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference #9 is granted. No appearance is required on 3/7/2019. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/4/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re memorandum in support of motion, #11 NOTICE OF FILING (Smith, Marc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC in support of motion for leave to file #9 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Smith, Marc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Marc Craig Smith for presentment of motion for leave to file #9 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 3/7/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Smith, Marc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC for leave to file MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE (Smith, Marc)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing set for 4/30/2019 at 09:00 AM. The filing of a joint status report is not required.Mailed notice (srn, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (sxb, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re notification of affiliates pursuant to local rule 3.2 #4 NOTICE OF FILING (Smith, Marc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re attorney appearance #3 , civil cover sheet #2 , complaint #1 NOTIFICATION OF AFFILIATES FRCP 7.1 AND LR 3.2 DISCLOSURE (Smith, Marc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC by Marc Craig Smith ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (Smith, Marc)
February 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Marc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT COMPLAINT-ACTION FOR DAMAGES FOR PROPERTY RIGHTS INFRINGEMENT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15500047. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe subscriber assigned IP address 107.201.57.238
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Marc Craig Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 107.201.57.238
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?