West Palm Beach Firefighters' Pension Fund v. Conagra Brands, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: West Palm Beach Firefighters' Pension Fund
Defendant: Anil Arora, Ruth Ann Marshall, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Rabo Securities USA, Inc., SUNTRUST ROBINSON HUMPHREY, INC., David S. Marberger, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., BTIG, LLC, Barclays Capital, Inc., Craig P Omtvedt, Richard H. Lenny, Conagra Brands, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Rajive Johri, Stephen G. Butler, Joie A Gregor, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Sean M. Connolly, Robert G. Wise, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Thomas K. Brown and RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Petitioner: Miami Police Relief & Pension Fund, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., City of Plantation Police Officers Pension Fund, Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds and National Elevator Industry Pension Fund
Case Number: 1:2019cv01323
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 68 AMENDED complaint by National Elevator Industry Pension Fund against All Defendants Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws (Saham, Scott)
June 28, 2019 Filing 67 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Applications by Andrew W. Hutton, Ting Liu, Scott H. Saham and Spencer A. Burkholz to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Movant National Elevator Industry Pension Fund are granted. Emailed notice (slb, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15966707. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Burkholz, Spencer)
June 25, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15966376. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Saham, Scott)
June 25, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION by Movant National Elevator Industry Pension Fund Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $150, receipt number 0752-15964289 (Liu, Ting)
June 25, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION by Movant National Elevator Industry Pension FundMotion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $150, receipt number 0752-15963764 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hutton, Andrew)
May 25, 2019 Filing 62 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The unopposed motion #61 of the Director Defendants to reassign Klein v. Arora et al, Case No. 19 C 3148, is granted under Local Rule 40.4. The reassignment will be effectuated with the Executive Committee. After the reassignment is implemented, the Court will set a status hearing in 19 C 3148, and a deadline in advance of the status hearing to present the stipulation referred to in R. 61 at 4. Emailed notice (Chang, Edmond)
May 24, 2019 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM notice of motion #60 by Anil Arora, Thomas K. Brown, Stephen G. Butler, Sean M. Connolly, Joie A Gregor, Rajive Johri, Richard H. Lenny, Ruth Ann Marshall, Craig P Omtvedt in Support of Director Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Reassignment of Related Case Pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Klein Complaint)(Duffy, Marjorie)
May 24, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Motion by Marjorie Patricia Duffy for reassignment of related case pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 6/10/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Duffy, Marjorie) Docket Text Modified by the Clerk's Office on 5/28/2019 (jh, ).
April 29, 2019 Filing 59 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Motion hearing held. Defendant Conagra's out-of-state attorneys appeared by telephone. As discussed during the hearing, all Local Rule 40.4 requirements are met, so Conagra's unopposed motion #23 to reassign and consolidate cases is granted. The Court recommends that the Executive Committee reassign case numbers 19 C 1805 and 19 C 2250 to the calendar of Judge Edmond E. Chang as related to 19 C 1323. As discussed during the hearing, Movant National Elevator Industry Pension Fund's motion to be appointed Lead Plaintiff and for appointment of Lead Counsel #30 is granted. The complaints in case numbers 19 C 1805 and 19 C 2250 are deemed operative in this case, 19 C 1323, but the Lead Plaintiff shall file a consolidated amended complaint. By 07/01/2019, Lead Plaintiff shall file the consolidated amended complaint under case number 19 C 1323. Answer to the consolidated complaint due 09/03/2019. Case numbers 19 C 1805 and 19 C 2250 will be administratively terminated; all filing shall be made in this case. The Clerk's Office shall transfer the appearances of all attorneys in 19 C 1805 and 19 C 2250 on to this docket. Joint initial status report due 09/03/2019. Status hearing set for 09/05/2019 at 9:30 a.m.Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
April 27, 2019 Filing 58 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Wells Fargo Securities, LLC (Motto, Joseph)
April 27, 2019 Filing 57 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Suntrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc. (Motto, Joseph)
April 27, 2019 Filing 56 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Scotia Capital (USA) Inc. (Motto, Joseph)
April 27, 2019 Filing 55 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by RBC Capital Markets, LLC (Motto, Joseph)
April 27, 2019 Filing 54 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Rabo Securities USA, Inc. (Motto, Joseph)
April 27, 2019 Filing 53 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by MUFG Securities Americas Inc. (Motto, Joseph)
April 27, 2019 Filing 52 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mizuho Securities USA LLC (Motto, Joseph)
April 27, 2019 Filing 51 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated (Motto, Joseph)
April 27, 2019 Filing 50 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC (Motto, Joseph)
April 27, 2019 Filing 49 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by HSBC Securities (USA) Inc. (Motto, Joseph)
April 27, 2019 Filing 48 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC (Motto, Joseph)
April 27, 2019 Filing 47 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by BTIG, LLC (Motto, Joseph)
April 27, 2019 Filing 46 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by BNP Paribas Securities Corp. (Motto, Joseph)
April 27, 2019 Filing 45 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Barclays Capital, Inc. (Motto, Joseph)
April 27, 2019 Filing 44 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BNP Paribas Securities Corp., BTIG, LLC, Barclays Capital, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Rabo Securities USA, Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Suntrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC by Michael James Stern (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stern, Michael)
April 27, 2019 Filing 43 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BNP Paribas Securities Corp., BTIG, LLC, Barclays Capital, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Rabo Securities USA, Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Suntrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC by Jeffrey John Huelskamp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Huelskamp, Jeffrey)
April 27, 2019 Filing 42 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BNP Paribas Securities Corp., BTIG, LLC, Barclays Capital, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Rabo Securities USA, Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Suntrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC by Joseph Laurence Motto (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Motto, Joseph)
April 27, 2019 Filing 41 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BNP Paribas Securities Corp., BTIG, LLC, Barclays Capital, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, MUFG Securities Americas Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Rabo Securities USA, Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Suntrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC by Robert Y. Sperling (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sperling, Robert)
April 26, 2019 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: If any counsel wish to participate by phone for the 04/29/2019 hearing, they may do so by notifying the courtroom deputy, Sandra Brooks @ (312) 408-5121, with the contact phone number by 8 a.m. Central Time on 04/29/2019. Also, in light of R. 39, the Oklahoma/Houston Funds' motion #24 is terminated. Emailed notice (slb, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System (Gilden, Carol)
April 26, 2019 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The Iron Workers et al. motion #33 for appointment as lead counsel is terminated as withdrawn by R. 37. The defense motion #22 to reassign, the Oklahoma/Houston Funds' motion #24 , and the National Elevator Fund #30 motion will be heard at 9 a.m. on 04/29/2019 (rather than 8:30 a.m.)Emailed and mailed notice (slb, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 37 Notice of Withdrawal of the Motion of the Pension Funds for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of their Selection of Lead Counsel by City of Plantation Police Officers Pension Fund, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds, Miami Police Relief & Pension Fund (Josefson, Avi)
April 23, 2019 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Avi Josefson regarding motion for miscellaneous relief, #33 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certifications, #2 Exhibit B - Loss Charts, #3 Exhibit C - Joint Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Pendency of First Filed Action, #5 Exhibit E - Bernstein Litowitz Resume)(Josefson, Avi)
April 23, 2019 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM by City of Plantation Police Officers Pension Fund, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds, Miami Police Relief & Pension Fund in support of motion for miscellaneous relief, #33 (Josefson, Avi)
April 23, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Motion by Avi Josefson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #33 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 4/29/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Josefson, Avi)
April 23, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION by Movants Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds, Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W., City of Plantation Police Officers Pension Fund, Miami Police Relief & Pension Fund for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of Their Selection of Lead Counsel, and Consolidation of Related Actions (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Josefson, Avi)
April 23, 2019 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM by National Elevator Industry Pension Fund in support of motion to consolidate cases,, motion for miscellaneous relief, #30 (Richter, Frank)
April 23, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Motion by Frank Anthony Richter for presentment of motion to consolidate cases,, motion for miscellaneous relief, #30 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 4/29/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Richter, Frank)
April 23, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION by Movant National Elevator Industry Pension Fund to consolidate cases , MOTION by Movant National Elevator Industry Pension Fund for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Estimate of losses, #4 Exhibit D - Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP firm resume, #5 Exhibit E - Text of Proposed Order)(Richter, Frank)
April 23, 2019 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Movant National Elevator Industry Pension Fund by Frank Anthony Richter (Richter, Frank)
April 23, 2019 Filing 28 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System (Gilden, Carol)
April 23, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION of STEVEN B. SINGER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Gilden, Carol)
April 23, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Carol V Gilden for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #24 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 4/29/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Gilden, Carol)
April 23, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #24 FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL (Gilden, Carol)
April 23, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION by Movants Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System, Houston Municipal Employees Pension SystemFOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF COUNSEL (Gilden, Carol)
April 18, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM notice of motion #22 by Anil Arora, Thomas K. Brown, Stephen G. Butler, Conagra Brands, Inc., Sean M. Connolly, Joie A Gregor, Rajive Johri, Richard H. Lenny, David S. Marberger, Ruth Ann Marshall, Craig P Omtvedt, Robert G. Wise In Support of the Conagra Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Reassignment of Related Cases Pursuant to Local Rule 40.4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01: Estrada, #2 Exhibit 02: HMEPS)(Duffy, Marjorie)
April 18, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Marjorie Patricia Duffy for presentment of before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 4/29/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Duffy, Marjorie)
April 11, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Application by Geoffrey Ritts to appear pro hac vice #19 on behalf of Conagra Brands, Inc. and the individual defendants is granted. Emailed notice (slb, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Application by Marjorie Duffy to appear pro hac vice #18 on behalf of Conagra Brands, Inc. and the individual defendants is granted. Emailed notice (slb, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15703001. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ritts, Geoffrey)
April 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15702860. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Duffy, Marjorie)
April 5, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff West Palm Beach Firefighters' Pension Fund by Lester R Hooker (Hooker, Lester)
April 5, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff West Palm Beach Firefighters' Pension Fund by Steven B Singer (Singer, Steven)
April 5, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff West Palm Beach Firefighters' Pension Fund by Joseph E. White, III (White, Joseph)
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff West Palm Beach Firefighters' Pension Fund by Carol V Gilden ATTORNEY APPEARANCE OF STEVEN B. SINGER (Gilden, Carol)
April 5, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff West Palm Beach Firefighters' Pension Fund by Carol V Gilden ATTORNEY APPEARANCE OF LESTER HOOKER (Gilden, Carol)
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff West Palm Beach Firefighters' Pension Fund by Carol V Gilden ATTORNEY APPEARANCE OF JOSEPH E. WHITE, III (Gilden, Carol)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The joint motion #8 to stay is granted. The answer deadline is suspended (which in turn suspends the MID deadlines). In light of the deadlines in the PSLRA, the status hearing of 04/17/2019 is reset to 06/17/2019 at 9:30 a.m., by which time the motion to appoint lead plaintiff and counsel should have been filed. The joint status report is due by 06/12/2019. Emailed notice (slb, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Conagra Brands, Inc. (Chung, Theodore)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Theodore Thomas Chung for presentment of extension of time, #8 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 4/2/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Chung, Theodore)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants Anil Arora, Thomas K. Brown, Stephen G. Butler, Conagra Brands, Inc., Sean M. Connolly, Joie A Gregor, Rajive Johri, Richard H. Lenny, David S. Marberger, Ruth Ann Marshall, Craig P Omtvedt, Robert G. Wise for extension of time Joint Motion for Postponement of Initial Status Hearing and Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chung, Theodore)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Anil Arora, Thomas K. Brown, Stephen G. Butler, Conagra Brands, Inc., Sean M. Connolly, Joie A Gregor, Rajive Johri, Richard H. Lenny, David S. Marberger, Ruth Ann Marshall, Craig P Omtvedt, Robert G. Wise by Theodore Thomas Chung (Chung, Theodore)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by West Palm Beach Firefighters' Pension Fund. Anil Arora waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Thomas K. Brown waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Stephen G. Butler waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Conagra Brands, Inc. waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Sean M. Connolly waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Joie A Gregor waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Rajive Johri waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Richard H. Lenny waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; David S. Marberger waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Ruth Ann Marshall waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Craig P Omtvedt waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019; Robert G. Wise waiver sent on 3/13/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Gilden, Carol)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 04/17/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases.Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
February 25, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Anil Arora, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., BTIG, LLC, Barclays Capital, Inc., Thomas K. Brown, Stephen G. Butler, Conagra Brands, Inc., Sean M. Connolly, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Joie A Gregor, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Rajive Johri, Richard H. Lenny, MUFG Securities Americas Inc., David S. Marberger, Ruth Ann Marshall, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Craig P Omtvedt, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Rabo Securities USA, Inc., Scotia Capital (USA) Inc., Suntrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Robert G. Wise (jjr, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
February 22, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff West Palm Beach Firefighters' Pension Fund by Carol V Gilden (Gilden, Carol)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gilden, Carol)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by West Palm Beach Firefighters' Pension Fund; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15516333.(Gilden, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Palm Beach Firefighters' Pension Fund v. Conagra Brands, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anil Arora
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Ann Marshall
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Marjorie Patricia Duffy
Represented By: Joseph Laurence Motto
Represented By: Robert Y. Sperling
Represented By: Jeffrey John Huelskamp
Represented By: Michael James Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabo Securities USA, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Marjorie Patricia Duffy
Represented By: Joseph Laurence Motto
Represented By: Robert Y. Sperling
Represented By: Jeffrey John Huelskamp
Represented By: Michael James Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNTRUST ROBINSON HUMPHREY, INC.
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Marjorie Patricia Duffy
Represented By: Joseph Laurence Motto
Represented By: Robert Y. Sperling
Represented By: Jeffrey John Huelskamp
Represented By: Michael James Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S. Marberger
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Marjorie Patricia Duffy
Represented By: Joseph Laurence Motto
Represented By: Robert Y. Sperling
Represented By: Jeffrey John Huelskamp
Represented By: Michael James Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTIG, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Laurence Motto
Represented By: Robert Y. Sperling
Represented By: Jeffrey John Huelskamp
Represented By: Michael James Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Marjorie Patricia Duffy
Represented By: Joseph Laurence Motto
Represented By: Robert Y. Sperling
Represented By: Jeffrey John Huelskamp
Represented By: Michael James Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig P Omtvedt
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard H. Lenny
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conagra Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Marjorie Patricia Duffy
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Marjorie Patricia Duffy
Represented By: Joseph Laurence Motto
Represented By: Robert Y. Sperling
Represented By: Jeffrey John Huelskamp
Represented By: Michael James Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Marjorie Patricia Duffy
Represented By: Joseph Laurence Motto
Represented By: Robert Y. Sperling
Represented By: Jeffrey John Huelskamp
Represented By: Michael James Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajive Johri
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen G. Butler
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joie A Gregor
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Marjorie Patricia Duffy
Represented By: Joseph Laurence Motto
Represented By: Robert Y. Sperling
Represented By: Jeffrey John Huelskamp
Represented By: Michael James Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Marjorie Patricia Duffy
Represented By: Joseph Laurence Motto
Represented By: Robert Y. Sperling
Represented By: Jeffrey John Huelskamp
Represented By: Michael James Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotia Capital (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Marjorie Patricia Duffy
Represented By: Joseph Laurence Motto
Represented By: Robert Y. Sperling
Represented By: Jeffrey John Huelskamp
Represented By: Michael James Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUFG Securities Americas Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Marjorie Patricia Duffy
Represented By: Joseph Laurence Motto
Represented By: Robert Y. Sperling
Represented By: Jeffrey John Huelskamp
Represented By: Michael James Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean M. Connolly
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert G. Wise
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Securities USA LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Marjorie Patricia Duffy
Represented By: Joseph Laurence Motto
Represented By: Robert Y. Sperling
Represented By: Jeffrey John Huelskamp
Represented By: Michael James Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas K. Brown
Represented By: Theodore Thomas Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey J. Ritts
Represented By: Marjorie Patricia Duffy
Represented By: Joseph Laurence Motto
Represented By: Robert Y. Sperling
Represented By: Jeffrey John Huelskamp
Represented By: Michael James Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Palm Beach Firefighters' Pension Fund
Represented By: Carol V Gilden
Represented By: Lester R Hooker
Represented By: Steven B Singer
Represented By: Joseph E. White, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miami Police Relief & Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: City of Plantation Police Officers Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Houston Municipal Employees Pension System
Represented By: Carol V Gilden
Represented By: Francis P. Mcconville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Iron Workers Local 580 Joint Funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: National Elevator Industry Pension Fund
Represented By: Frank Anthony Richter
Represented By: Spencer A Burkholz
Represented By: Scott H Saham
Represented By: Ting Liu
Represented By: Andrew W. Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?