Sunfinity Solar-CA, LLC v. Renewable Asset Management Company, LLC/Project Solar, LLC
Petitioner: Sunfinity Solar-CA, LLC
Respondent: Renewable Asset Management Company, LLC/Project Solar, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01398
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by William Charles O'Neil for presentment of motion for default judgment, #10 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 5/1/2019 at 09:45 AM. (O'Neil, William)
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 SEALED EXHIBIT by Petitioner Sunfinity Solar-CA, LLC (Exhibit B - Arbitration Award) regarding MOTION by Petitioner Sunfinity Solar-CA, LLC for default judgment as to Respondent Renewable Asset Management Company, LLC/Project Solar, LLC #10 (O'Neil, William)
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Petitioner Sunfinity Solar-CA, LLC for default judgment as to Respondent Renewable Asset Management Company, LLC/Project Solar, LLC (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(O'Neil, William)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The briefing schedule on plaintiff's motion to confirm arbitration award #1 is as follows: defendant's response is due 4/3/19; plaintiff's reply 4/24/19. A status hearing is set for 6/5/19 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service by William Charles O'Neil on behalf of Sunfinity Solar-CA, LLC (O'Neil, William)
February 27, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. (nsf, )
February 27, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Sunfinity Solar-CA, LLC by Anthony Matthew Durkin (Durkin, Anthony)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Sunfinity Solar-CA, LLC (O'Neil, William)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Sunfinity Solar-CA, LLC by William Charles O'Neil (O'Neil, William)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (O'Neil, William)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 SEALED EXHIBIT by Petitioner Sunfinity Solar-CA, LLC Exhibit B regarding miscellaneous case #1 (O'Neil, William)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED EXHIBIT by Petitioner Sunfinity Solar-CA, LLC Exhibit A regarding miscellaneous case #1 (O'Neil, William)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE by Sunfinity Solar-CA, LLC Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 0752-15527065. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(O'Neil, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunfinity Solar-CA, LLC v. Renewable Asset Management Company, LLC/Project Solar, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renewable Asset Management Company, LLC/Project Solar, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sunfinity Solar-CA, LLC
Represented By: William Charles O'Neil
Represented By: Anthony Matthew Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?