J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Burgess et al

Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Smitty's Lounge, Inc. and Antonio Burgess
Case Number: 1:2019cv01428
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice(vcf, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for default judgment in the amended amount of $10,000.00 #6 is granted. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (vcf, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff J&J Sports Productions, Inc. by Boris G Samovalov (Samovalov, Boris)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Zane D. Smith for presentment of motion for default judgment #6 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 4/9/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Smith, Zane)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff J&J Sports Productions, Inc. for default judgment as to ANTONIO BURGESS, indv. and d/b/a SMITTYS LOUNGE, INC. and SMITTYS LOUNGE, INC. (Smith, Zane)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. as to Smitty's Lounge, Inc. on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Smith, Zane)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. as to Antonio Burgess on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Smith, Zane)
February 28, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Antonio Burgess, Smitty's Lounge, Inc. (pj, )
February 27, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff J&J Sports Productions, Inc. by Zane D. Smith (Smith, Zane)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Zane)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc. ; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15532755.(Smith, Zane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Burgess et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smitty's Lounge, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Zane D. Smith
Represented By: Boris G Samovalov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?