J&J Sports Production, Inc. v. Alba et al

Plaintiff: J&J Sports Production, Inc.
Defendant: El Barrio Mexican Restaurant and David Alba
Case Number: 1:2019cv01429
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the status report, the status hearing of 04/19/2019 is reset to 06/10/2019 at 9:30 a.m. That is after the 90-day service period, so Plaintiff should earnestly continue the recently started service efforts. Another status report is due by 06/03/2019. Emailed notice (slb, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS Report by J&J Sports Production, Inc. (Samovalov, Boris)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff J&J Sports Production, Inc. by Boris G Samovalov (Samovalov, Boris)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 04/19/2019 at 9:30 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases.Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
February 28, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant David Alba (pj, )
February 27, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff J&J Sports Production, Inc. by Zane D. Smith (Smith, Zane)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Zane)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by J&J Sports Production, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15532794.(Smith, Zane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Production, Inc. v. Alba et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Barrio Mexican Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Alba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Production, Inc.
Represented By: Zane D. Smith
Represented By: Boris G Samovalov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?