J&J Sports Production, Inc. v. Collins et al

Plaintiff: J&J Sports Production, Inc.
Defendant: SLR Ventures Inc., Shirley Collins and SLR Ventures, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01430
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Defendants' motion to dismiss #18 is denied without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 5.3(b).Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendants Shirley Collins, SLR Ventures, LLC. to dismiss and Memorandum in Support (Fenton, Ernest)
April 22, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Shirley Collins, SLR Ventures, LLC. by Keoini Joyce Haynes Wells (Haynes Wells, Keoini)
April 22, 2019 Filing 16 Attorney Appearance by Shirley Collins (Fenton, Ernest)
April 9, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 5/8/2019 at 9:00 a.m. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for default judgment #9 is denied, and Defendants' motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead to complaint #14 is granted. Defendants shall respond to the complaint by 4/22/2019. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant SLR Ventures, LLC. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Fenton, Ernest)
April 9, 2019 Filing 13 Attorney Appearance by SLR Ventures, LLC. and Shirley Collins (Fenton, Ernest)
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff J&J Sports Production, Inc. by Boris G Samovalov (Samovalov, Boris)
April 2, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The status hearing set for 4/3/2019 #7 is stricken and re-set for 4/9/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Zane D. Smith for presentment of motion for default judgment #9 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/9/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Smith, Zane)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff J&J Sports Production, Inc. for default judgment as to SHIRLEY COLLINS, indv. and d/b/a SLR VENTURES, LLC. (Smith, Zane)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS Report by J&J Sports Production, Inc. (Smith, Zane)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 4/3/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Production, Inc. as to SLR Ventures, LLC. on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Smith, Zane)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Production, Inc. as to Shirley Collins on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Smith, Zane)
February 28, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Shirley Collins, SLR Ventures, LLC. (pj, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
February 27, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff J&J Sports Production, Inc. by Zane D. Smith (Smith, Zane)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Zane)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by J&J Sports Production, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15532841.(Smith, Zane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Production, Inc. v. Collins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLR Ventures Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Collins
Represented By: Keoini Joyce Haynes Wells
Represented By: Ernest B Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLR Ventures, LLC.
Represented By: Keoini Joyce Haynes Wells
Represented By: Ernest B Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Production, Inc.
Represented By: Zane D. Smith
Represented By: Boris G Samovalov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?