Block et al v. Red Lobster Management LLC

Plaintiff: Christopher Block and Michael G Murphy
Defendant: Red Lobster Management LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01434
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendant's extension motion #12 to answer is granted to 06/17/2019. The joint initial joint status report is due by 06/27/2019. The status hearing of 06/10/2019 is reset to 07/10/2019 at 8:30 a.m. (NOTE: not the date and time listed in the motion). Mandatory Initial Discovery disclosures are due by 07/17/2019.Emailed notice (slb, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by John Conlaeth McIlwee for presentment of extension of time #12 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 4/25/2019 at 09:30 AM. (McIlwee, John)
April 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Red Lobster Management LLC for extension of time to Extend Deadlines (Agreed) (McIlwee, John)
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Red Lobster Management LLC by Melissa M Hewitt (Hewitt, Melissa)
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Red Lobster Management LLC by John Conlaeth McIlwee (McIlwee, John)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Block, Michael G Murphy as to Red Lobster Management LLC on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. (York, Adam)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On review of the status report, the status hearing of 04/19/2019 is reset to 06/10/2019 at 9:30 a.m. That is after the 90-day service period, so Plaintiff should earnestly continue the service efforts. Another status report is due by 06/03/2019. Emailed notice (slb, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS Report Plaintiffs' Initial Status Report by Christopher Block, Michael G Murphy (York, Adam)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Christopher Block, Michael G Murphy by Michael James Aschenbrener (Aschenbrener, Michael)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 04/19/2019 at 9:30 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases.Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lf, )
February 28, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Red Lobster Management LLC (pj, )
February 27, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Christopher Block, Michael G Murphy by Adam C York (York, Adam)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (York, Adam)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Nationwide Class Action Complaint filed by Christopher Block, Michael G Murphy; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15533872.(York, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Block et al v. Red Lobster Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Block
Represented By: Adam C York
Represented By: Michael James Aschenbrener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael G Murphy
Represented By: Adam C York
Represented By: Michael James Aschenbrener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Lobster Management LLC
Represented By: Melissa M Hewitt
Represented By: John Conlaeth McIlwee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?