Knowles v. Chicago Guest House, LLC

Plaintiff: Carlton Knowles
Defendant: Chicago Guest House, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01868
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Plaintiff has filed a notice of voluntary dismissal #19 , the terms of which are set forth therein. The status hearing set for 7/16/2019 #15 is stricken. Civil case closed.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carlton Knowles (Lee, C.K.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff is reminded that court action must be requested by motion, not by letter.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 Letter Request for Extension of Time to Execute Service by Carlton Knowles (Lee, C.K.)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlton Knowles as to Chicago Guest House, LLC on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Lee, C.K.)
June 13, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff's motion to continue the status hearing #14 is granted.The status hearing set for 6/20/2019 #12 is stricken and re-set for 7/16/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Motion hearing set for 6/17/2019 #13 is stricken. The court has twice cautioned Plaintiff regarding the requirements of Civil Rule 4(m). On the court's own motion, the time for Plaintiff to comply with Civil Rule 4(m) is extended to 7/8/2019. If Plaintiff does not by that date take any of the actions contemplated by Civil Rule 4(m), this case will be dismissed without prejudice.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Carlton Knowles to continue the status hearing currently scheduled for 6/20/2019 at 9:00am (Lee, C.K.)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by C.K. Lee for presentment of before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/17/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Lee, C.K.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff's motion to continue the status hearing #11 is granted. The status hearing set for 6/4/2019 #8 is stricken and re-set for 6/20/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff again is reminded of the requirements of Civil Rule 4(m). Motion hearing set for 5/30/2019 #10 is stricken. For future reference, Plaintiff is reminded that, absent emergency, a motion must be filed three business days prior to presentment. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Carlton Knowles to continue the Initial Status Hearing currently set for June 4, 2019 (Lee, C.K.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 Second NOTICE of Motion by C.K. Lee for presentment of before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 5/30/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Lee, C.K.)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED complaint by Carlton Knowles against Chicago Guest House, LLC (Lee, C.K.)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff's motion to continue the status hearing #7 is granted. The status hearing set for 4/22/2019 #4 is stricken and re-set for 6/4/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff is reminded of the requirements of Civil Rule 4(m). Motion hearing set for 4/18/2019 #6 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Carlton Knowles to continue status hearing (Lee, C.K.)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by C.K. Lee for presentment of before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 4/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Lee, C.K.)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by C.K. Lee of Change of Address (Lee, C.K.)
March 20, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Chicago Guest House, LLC (rc, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff has until 4/18/2019 to comply with Local Rule 83.15. Failure to comply will result in the summary dismissal of this suit. Status hearing set for 4/22/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
March 18, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lee, C.K.)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Carlton Knowles; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15604658.(Lee, C.K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knowles v. Chicago Guest House, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton Knowles
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Guest House, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?