In Re: Humira (Adalimumab) Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: UFCW LOCAL 1500 WELFARE FUND, Plaintiffs, Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Louisiana, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Kentucky Laborers District Council Health and Welfare Fund and St. Paul Electrical Workers' Health Plan and Law Enforcement Health Benefits Inc.
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., SANDOZ, INC., MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ABBVIE INC., MYLAN INC., PFIZER INC., AMGEN INC., FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC, ABBVIE BIOTECHNOLOGY LTD. and SAMSUNG BIOEPIS CO., LTD.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01873
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MOTION by Plaintiff St. Paul Electrical Workers' Health Plan and Law Enforcement Health Benefits Inc. to substitute attorney Lisa B. Weinstein of the law firm of Grant & Eisenhofer P.A. as counsel in place of Deborah A. Elman (Weinstein, Lisa)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw as attorney #184 is granted. (mss)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw as attorney #184 is granted. (mss)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MOTION by Attorney David C. Giardina to withdraw as attorney for Amgen Inc.. No party information provided (Giardina, David)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund by Jayne Goldstein (Goldstein, Jayne)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motions to withdraw as counsel of record #178 #181 are granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MOTION by Plaintiff Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Louisiana to withdraw Jason A. Zweig, MOTION to withdraw as attorney for Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Louisiana. No party information provided (Barnes, Lauren)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Louisiana by Daniel J. Kurowski (Kurowski, Daniel)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER dated 11/23/2020 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal, #174 ; Appellate case no.: 20-2402; Upon consideration of the Motion To Withdraw as Counsel, filed on November 19, 2020, by counsel for the appellees, It Is Ordered that the motion is Granted and attorney Damon C. Andrews may withdraw from further representation of appellees AbbVie, Inc., and AbbVie Biotechnology Ltd. (ph, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MOTION by Attorney Nicole A. Heise to withdraw as attorney for Amgen Inc.. No party information provided (Heise, Nicole)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal, #174 ; USCA Case No. 20-2402 (nsf, )
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal, #174 . Notified counsel (lma, )
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal, #174 (lma, )
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE of appeal by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Louisiana, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund regarding orders #170 , #173 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-17260547. Receipt number: n (Garvey, Karin)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiffs have decided not to file an amended complaint and they request that the court convert its dismissal of the complaint to one with prejudice. See #171 . The plaintiffs' request is granted. The complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The clerk shall enter judgment in favor of defendants and terminate the case. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 STATUS Report by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Louisiana, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund (Sharp, Christina)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/8/2020: Defendants' motion to dismiss #123 is granted. The complaint is dismissed without prejudice and with leave to file an amended complaint. Barry Aviation Inc. v. Land O'Lakes Mun. Airport Comm'n, 377 F.3d 682, 687 (7th Cir. 2004); Runnion ex rel. Runnion v. Girl Scouts of Greater Chicago & Nw. Indiana, 786 F.3d 510, 518 (7th Cir. 2015). Plaintiffs shall file a status report on June 29, 2020, with a statement of whether they intend to file an amended complaint, or if they instead prefer that the dismissal convert to a dismissal with prejudice so they may seek appellate review. [For further detail see attached order.] Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket5, )
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 RESPONSE by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd. to other,, #167 re Notice of Supplemental Authority (Watral, Diana)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Louisiana, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Garvey, Karin)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw as attorney #163 is granted. Elizabeth R. Odette is terminated as counsel of record. Notices mailed. (psm, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MOTION by Attorney Elizabeth R. Odette to withdraw as attorney for Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund. No party information provided (Odette, Elizabeth)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (td, )
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw as attorney #158 is granted. Lisa B. Weinstein is terminated as counsel of record. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE by Stephen Weissman of Change of Address (Weissman, Stephen)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Motion by Lisa B Weinstein for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #158 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 2/4/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Weinstein, Lisa)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MOTION by Attorney Lisa B. Weinstein to withdraw as attorney for St. Paul Electrical Workers' Health Plan and Law Enforcement Health Benefits Inc.. No party information provided (Weinstein, Lisa)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Louisiana by TerriAnne Benedetto (Benedetto, TerriAnne)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 1st MOTION by Plaintiff Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Louisiana for leave to appear as Attorney 1st (Benedetto, TerriAnne)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16597638. (Benedetto, TerriAnne)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 REPLY by Defendant Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #123 / Defendant Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Simmons, Ian)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 REPLY by Defendant Sandoz, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #123 (Supplemental Reply) (Weissman, Stephen)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 REPLY by Amgen Inc. to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Amgen Inc., Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd., Sandoz, Inc. #123 (Supplemental) (Giardina, David)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 REPLY by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #123 , sealed response,, #144 (Supplemental Reply) (Watral, Diana)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 REPLY by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Amgen Inc., Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd., Sandoz, Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #123 , sealed response,, #144 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Watral, Diana)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MEMORANDUM by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Louisiana, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #123 (Redacted) (Sharp, Christina)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to seal document #146 is granted. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Motion by Christina Sharp for presentment of motion to seal document, #146 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 11/26/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Sharp, Christina)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MOTION by Plaintiffs Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Louisiana, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund to seal document sealed response,, #144 (Sharp, Christina)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 DECLARATION of Scott Grzenczyk regarding sealed response,, #144 in Support if Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sharp, Christina)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 SEALED RESPONSE by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Louisiana, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Amgen Inc., Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd., Sandoz, Inc. #123 (Sharp, Christina)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw as attorney #141 is granted. Brian Morrison is terminated as counsel of record. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE of Motion by Karin E. Garvey for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #141 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 11/21/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Garvey, Karin)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MOTION by Attorney Brian Morrison to withdraw as attorney for UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund. No party information provided (Garvey, Karin)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #134 #135 are granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #117 #119 are granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file single a 65-page response brief #136 is granted. Defendants are free to submit a request for their replies at that time. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Christina Sharp for presentment of motion for order,, #136 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 11/19/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Sharp, Christina)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION by Plaintiffs Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Louisiana, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund for order regarding Page Limits and Format for Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Motions to Dismiss (Unopposed) (Sharp, Christina)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16424447. (Dugan, ii, James)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16424239. (Scalia, David)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Concerning the Confidentiality of Sealed Exhibits Included with Motion to Dismiss Briefing. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/15/2019. Notices mailed. (psm, )
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for order regarding the confidentiality of sealed exhibits included with the motion to dismiss briefing #121 is granted. Enter Order. The motion for leave to file under seal #127 is granted. No appearance on 10/16/19 is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MEMORANDUM by Sandoz, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #123 (Supplemental) (Weissman, Stephen)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #123 (Simmons, Ian)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM by AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #123 (Watral, Diana)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Motion by Diana M. Watral for presentment of motion to seal document #127 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/16/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Watral, Diana)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Amgen Inc. to seal document sealed document #126 (Watral, Diana)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Amgen Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14, #2 Exhibit 15)(Watral, Diana)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM by Amgen Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #123 (Supplemental) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Giardina, David)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM by AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Amgen Inc., Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd., Sandoz, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #123 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Watral, Diana)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Amgen Inc., Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd., Sandoz, Inc. (Watral, Diana)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE of Motion by Diana M. Watral for presentment of motion for order #121 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/16/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Watral, Diana)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Amgen Inc. for order regarding the Confidentiality of Sealed Exhibits Included with Motion to Dismiss Briefing (Watral, Diana)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Louisiana, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund as to Defendant Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC (Garvey, Karin)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16306246. (Andrews, Damon)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC by Matthew Robert Dalsanto (Dalsanto, Matthew)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16192095. (LENISKI, JOE)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The court accepts defendants' proposal for briefing motions to dismiss, in part. Defendants may file a joint brief up to 45 pages, with individual defense briefs up to 5 pages. Plaintiffs' consolidated opposition brief may be up to 45 pages, with 5-page responses to individual defendants. Defendants' joint reply brief may be up to 20 pages, with 2-page individual replies. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. by Brian Patrick Quinn (Quinn, Brian)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. by Kurt Christopher Brown (Brown, Kurt)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #104 #105 #111 #112 are granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16154036. (Crevier, Jonathan)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16154014. (Perez, Matthew)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STATUS Report Regarding Proposed Page Limits by Plaintiffs (Sharp, Christina)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Consolidated AMENDED complaint by Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Louisiana, Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund against AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd., Amgen Inc., Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC, Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd., Sandoz, Inc. (Sharp, Christina)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE by Christopher Joseph Letkewicz of Change of Address (Letkewicz, Christopher)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #106 sent to Attorney Brian Morrison returned as: Unknown address error. Mailed to attorney Brian Morrison a letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@ilnd.uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (mc, )
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiffs' consolidated complaint shall be filed by 8/9/19. Motions to dismiss shall be filed by 10/11/19, responses by 11/19/19, replies by 12/20/19. The parties may submit a proposal for page limits by 8/19/19, but are advised that the court may not grant more than 25 pages per brief even if the parties are in agreement. Notwithstanding the potential complexity of the complaint, the schedule gives the parties sufficient time to edit and refine their arguments. Discovery is stayed while the parties brief the motions to dismiss. The court may revisit the stay after the reply briefs are filed, and the parties should meet and confer over the terms of a protective order and ESI protocol. In addition, defendants should confirm with plaintiffs that documents and ESI are being appropriately preserved. Notices mailed. (psm, )
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16042557. on behalf of Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. (Brown, Kurt)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16042528. on behalf of Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. (Quinn, Brian)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. by Stephen Joel McIntyre (McIntyre, Stephen)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. by Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw (Bradshaw, Benjamin)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. by Ian Simmons (Simmons, Ian)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STATUS Report by Plaintiffs (Sharp, Christina)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs St. Paul Electrical Workers' Health Plan, Law Enforcement Health Benefits Inc. by Deborah Elman (Elman, Deborah)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiffs' amended consolidated complaint shall be filed by 8/12/19. A joint status report shall be filed by 7/12/19 containing any proposals for briefing anticipated motions to dismiss (to include page limits and briefing schedules) and a discovery schedule (competing positions about discovery shall be set out in the joint report, in a single filing). The court will enter an appropriate scheduling order after receipt of the status report. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STATUS Report by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund (Garvey, Karin)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE by Kyle Alan Shamberg of Change of Address (Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation) (Shamberg, Kyle)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE by Katrina Carroll of Change of Address (Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation) (Carroll, Katrina)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #73 #74 #75 #76 #77 #78 #84 #85 #86 #89 #90 #91 are granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Consolidating Cases and Appointing Interim Class Counsel. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/4/2019. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiffs' joint motion for consolidation and appointment of interim class counsel #87 is granted. Enter order. Lead counsel shall file a status report by 6/12/19 with a proposal for a deadline to file an amended complaint. Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15874942. (Davis, Frank)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15872921. (Ward, Vincent)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15872713. (Goldberg, Joseph)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 DECLARATION of Karin E. Garvey regarding motion to consolidate cases #87 Declaration of Karin E. Garvey in Support of Plaintiffs' Joint Application for Consolidation and Appointment of Interim Class Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Index of Exhibits)(Garvey, Karin)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION by Plaintiff UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund to consolidate cases Joint Application for Consolidation and Appointment of Interim Class Counsel (Garvey, Karin)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15859276. (Pessin, Adam)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15859185. (Istvan, Jeffrey)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15859097. (Liebenberg, Roberta)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiffs' joint brief in support of a proposed leadership structure is due 5/24/19. No notice of presentment is necessary. The court will issue an order by cm/ecf, and plaintiffs should submit any proposed order to proposed_order_shah@ilnd.uscourts.gov. Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STATUS Report by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund (Hogan, Brian)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 05/02/19 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Order Number: 34743. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway, OCR, colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov or 312.435.5594. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2019. (Conway, Colleen)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE by Michael S. Pullos of Change of Address (Pullos, Michael)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. Defendants' responses to the complaints are stayed. By 5/16/19, plaintiff's counsel in lead case 19 C 1873 shall file a status report with a proposal for moving plaintiffs' cases forward. Any defendants may file a response to the status report by 5/23/19. Case nos. 19 C 2674, 19 C 2799, and 19 C 2904 shall be reassigned to this court based on the agreement of the parties. Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15782039. (Marriott, David)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15782011. (Byars, Brent)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15781988. (Even, Yonatan)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15762374. (McIntyre, Stephen )
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15762342. (Bradshaw, Benjamin)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15756854. (Simmons, Ian)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. (Quinn, Thomas)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Notice of Reservation of Defenses by Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. (Quinn, Thomas)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. by Sondra A. Hemeryck (Hemeryck, Sondra)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. by Ronald S. Safer (Safer, Ronald)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd. by Thomas B. Quinn (Quinn, Thomas)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sandoz, Inc. by Elisa Greer Beneze (Beneze, Elisa)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sandoz, Inc. by William Connor Lavery (Lavery, William)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sandoz, Inc. by Michael James Perry (Perry, Michael)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sandoz, Inc. by Stephen Weissman (Weissman, Stephen)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Tal Elmatad (Elmatad, Tal)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Cristina Marie Fernandez (Fernandez, Cristina)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Michael Keeley (Keeley, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pfizer Inc. by Michael S. Pullos (Pullos, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pfizer Inc. by Lijun Zhang (Zhang, Lijun)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pfizer Inc. by Kathryn Swisher (Swisher, Kathryn)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pfizer Inc. by Sheryn E. George (George, Sheryn)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pfizer Inc. by Ross Elfand (Elfand, Ross)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pfizer Inc. by Raj Suresh Gandesha (Gandesha, Raj)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pfizer Inc. by Robert A Milne (Milne, Robert)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amgen Inc. by Nicole Heise (Heise, Nicole)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amgen Inc. by Steven Joseph Horowitz (Horowitz, Steven)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amgen Inc. by Nisha Chandran (Chandran, Nisha)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #27 #28 #29 #31 #33 #34 #35 #40 #41 #42 #43 #44 #45 #46 #47 are granted. Notices mailed. (psm, )
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pfizer Inc. by John J. Hamill, Jr (Hamill, John)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC by Dawanna Lashawn Mccray (Mccray, Dawanna)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15698700. (Zhang, Lijun)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15698670. (Swisher, Kathryn)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15698624. (George, Sheryn)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15698437. (Elfand, Ross)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15698366. (Gandesha, Raj)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15698232. (Milne, Robert)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15689001. (Himes, Jay)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15688923. (Minerva, Domenico)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Correction regarding #38 . (jh, )
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 DUPLICATE FILING OF DOCUMENT #7 . (jh, ) Modified on 4/8/2019 (jh, )
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC by Kelly Elizabeth Mannion (Mannion, Kelly)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC by Kimball Richard Anderson (Anderson, Kimball)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15679214. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Attachment A - List of admissions)(Fernandez, Cristina)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15679054. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Attachment A - List of admissions)(Keeley, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15678547. (Elmatad, Tal)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sandoz, Inc. by Christopher Joseph Letkewicz (Letkewicz, Christopher)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15677978. for Defendant Sandoz, Inc. (Beneze, Elisa)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Sandoz, Inc. by Christopher Page Wilson (Wilson, Christopher)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15677968. for Defendant Sandoz, Inc. (Lavery, William)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15677963. for Defendant Sandoz, Inc. (Perry, Michael)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15677960. for Defendant Sandoz, Inc. (Weissman, Stephen)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Andrew Gordon May (May, Andrew)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Scott Jared Fisher (Fisher, Scott)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 04/02/19 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Order Number: 34230. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway, 312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 4/24/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2019. (Conway, Colleen)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, defendants' motion to reassign related cases #10 is granted. Fraternal Order of Police v. AbbVie Inc., et al., Case No. 1:19-cv-1933, and Mayor & City Council of Baltimore v. AbbVie Inc., et al., Case No. 1:19-cv-2015 shall be submitted for reassignment to this court. By agreement of the parties in open court, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operating Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R v. AbbVie, Inc., et al., Case No. 19-cv-2226 shall also be submitted for reassignment to this court. Counsel for defendants may contact the courtroom deputy if plaintiff in Trades Services MN Welfare Fund v. AbbVie Inc., et al., Case No. 19-cv-2182, has no objection to reassignment, and that case will be submitted for reassignment and no separate motion will be necessary. If plaintiff objects, defendants must file a motion seeking reassignment. The clerk shall designate St. Paul Electrical Workers' Health Plan v. AbbVie Inc, et al., Case No. 19-cv-2196 currently assigned to this court as related to the above cases. Defendants' responses to the complaints are stayed pending further court proceedings. The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #18 , #19 , #20 , #21 , and #22 are granted. Continued status hearing is set for 5/2/19 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15660416. (Van Der Meulen, Robin)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15660401. (Morrison, Brian)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15659937. (Garvey, Karin)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15659913. (McDonald, Christopher)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15659863. (Asciolla, Gregory)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amgen Inc. by David C. Giardina (Giardina, David)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amgen Inc. by Bruce Roger Braun (Braun, Bruce)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund as to Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (Freed, Michael)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UFCW Local 1500 Welfare Fund as to AbbVie Inc. on 3/21/2019, answer due 4/11/2019; Amgen Inc. on 3/21/2019, answer due 4/11/2019; Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC on 3/21/2019, answer due 4/11/2019; Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 3/21/2019, answer due 4/11/2019; Mylan Inc. on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019; Pfizer Inc. on 3/21/2019, answer due 4/11/2019; Sandoz, Inc. on 3/21/2019, answer due 4/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service, #2 Return of Service, #3 Return of Service, #4 Return of Service, #5 Return of Service, #6 Return of Service)(Freed, Michael)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd. (Watral, Diana)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by AbbVie Inc. (Watral, Diana)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Diana M. Watral for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #10 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 4/2/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Watral, Diana)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd. to Reassign Related Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Watral, Diana)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd. by Diana M. Watral (Watral, Diana)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Biotechnology Ltd. by James F. Hurst (Hurst, James)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants AbbVie Inc., Amgen Inc., Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC, Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Sandoz, Inc. (kb, )
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff UFCW LOCAL 1500 WELFARE FUND by Brian M. Hogan (Hogan, Brian)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff UFCW LOCAL 1500 WELFARE FUND by Robert J. Wozniak (Wozniak, Robert)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff UFCW LOCAL 1500 WELFARE FUND by Steven A Kanner (Kanner, Steven)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff UFCW LOCAL 1500 WELFARE FUND by Michael Jerry Freed (Freed, Michael)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Freed, Michael)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by UFCW LOCAL 1500 WELFARE FUND; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15605035. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Freed, Michael)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Humira (Adalimumab) Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Brent M. Byars
Represented By: David Marriott
Represented By: Yonatan Even
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ, INC.
Represented By: Stephen Weissman
Represented By: William Connor Lavery
Represented By: Michael James Perry
Represented By: Elisa Greer Beneze
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Letkewicz
Represented By: Christopher Page Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOMENTA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Michael L. Keeley
Represented By: Andrew Gordon May
Represented By: Cristina Marie Fernandez
Represented By: Michael Keeley
Represented By: Tal Elmatad
Represented By: Scott Jared Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBVIE INC.
Represented By: Diana M. Watral
Represented By: James F. Hurst
Represented By: Damon C. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Represented By: Brent M. Byars
Represented By: David Marriott
Represented By: Yonatan Even
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER INC.
Represented By: Lijun Zhang
Represented By: Ross Elfand
Represented By: Kathryn Swisher
Represented By: Raj Suresh Gandesha
Represented By: Robert A Milne
Represented By: Michael S. Pullos
Represented By: John J. Hamill, Jr.
Represented By: Sheryn E. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMGEN INC.
Represented By: David C. Giardina
Represented By: Steven Joseph Horowitz
Represented By: Nisha Chandran
Represented By: Bruce Roger Braun
Represented By: Nicole Heise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRESENIUS KABI USA, LLC
Represented By: Kimball Richard Anderson
Represented By: Kelly Elizabeth Mannion
Represented By: Dawanna Lashawn Mccray
Represented By: Matthew Robert DalSanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABBVIE BIOTECHNOLOGY LTD.
Represented By: Diana M. Watral
Represented By: James F. Hurst
Represented By: Damon C. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG BIOEPIS CO., LTD.
Represented By: Ronald S. Safer
Represented By: Ian Simmons
Represented By: Sondra A. Hemeryck
Represented By: Benjamin Gardner Bradshaw
Represented By: Stephen McIntyre
Represented By: Thomas B. Quinn
Represented By: Brian Patrick Quinn
Represented By: Kurt Christopher Brown
Represented By: Stephen Joel McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UFCW LOCAL 1500 WELFARE FUND
Represented By: Michael Jerry Freed
Represented By: Brian M. Hogan
Represented By: Steven A Kanner
Represented By: Robert J. Wozniak
Represented By: Gregory Asciolla
Represented By: Jeffrey Istvan
Represented By: Robin Van Der Meulen
Represented By: Karin E. Garvey
Represented By: Brian Morrison
Represented By: Vincent J Ward
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg
Represented By: Jay L Himes
Represented By: Adam J Pessin
Represented By: Roberta D. Liebenberg
Represented By: Frank T Davis
Represented By: Christopher J McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Locals 302 & 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Health and Security Trust Fund
Represented By: Jonathan Scott Crevier
Represented By: Matthew J Perez
Represented By: Christina Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Louisiana
Represented By: Christina Sharp
Represented By: Daniel J. Kurowski
Represented By: David S. Scalia
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Represented By: TerriAnne Benedetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipe Trades Services MN Welfare Fund
Represented By: Christina Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Represented By: Christina Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund
Represented By: Christina Sharp
Represented By: Jayne Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentucky Laborers District Council Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: JOE P. LENISKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Electrical Workers' Health Plan and Law Enforcement Health Benefits Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?