Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 162.195.236.23
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 162.195.236.23
Case Number: 1:2019cv01888
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: #1 certified order)(cc, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle:Civil case terminated #10 . Mailed notice (ewf, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Malibu Media, LLC without prejudice (Schulz, Mary)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER On Motion For Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena prior to A Rule 26(f) conference. (Document has wrong case number on it) Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 4/11/2019. Mailed notice (nsf, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference #5 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, April 12, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #5 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 4/12/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (nsf, )
March 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15609600. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 162.195.236.23
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 162.195.236.23
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?