Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 205.178.47.169
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 205.178.47.169
Case Number: 1:2019cv01890
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 MAILED Copyright report with certified copy of minute order dated 6/12/2019 to Registrar, Washington, DC. (Attachments: #1 certified order) (bg, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Pursuant to the notice of voluntary dismissal #10 , this case is dismissed with prejudice. No appearance on 6/12/19 is necessary. Civil case terminated. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Malibu Media, LLC with prejudice (Schulz, Mary)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference #6 is granted. Plaintiff has demonstrated good cause to conduct early discovery, in order to identify the defendant in this case. Plaintiff may issue a Rule 45 subpoena to the internet service provider associated with the defendant IP address to obtain the name and address of the subscriber, and Plaintiff may use the information solely for purposes of this litigation. No appearance on the motion is necessary. A status hearing is set for 6/12/19 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed. (psm, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 4/16/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCfor early discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington, DC (bg, )
March 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15609631. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 205.178.47.169
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 205.178.47.169
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?