Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 24.12.196.155
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 24.12.196.155
Case Number: 1:2019cv01892
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: #1 order)(las, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Pursuant to plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal #14 , this case is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice, pursuant Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Any pending motions or schedules in this case are stricken as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (is, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Malibu Media, LLC without prejudice (Schulz, Mary)
June 6, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Initial status hearing set for 6/20/2019 is stricken and reset to 7/18/2019 at 09:30 AM. pursuant to plaintiff's status report #12 . Mailed notice (is, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS Report by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Initial status hearing set for 5/22/2019 is stricken and reset to 6/20/2019 at 09:30 AM. pursuant to plaintiff's status report #10 . Mailed notice (is, )
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS Report by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference #6 is granted. Motion hearing noticed for 4/18/2019 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (is, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 4/18/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC for leave to serve a Third Party Subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 4/9/2019 (jh, ).
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 5/22/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED copyright report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (gcy, )
March 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15609676. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 24.12.196.155
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 24.12.196.155
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?