Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 65.119.181.2
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv01893
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 14 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: #1 order)(las, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Pursuant to Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal, this case is dismissed without prejudice as to John Doe, IP address 65.119.181.2. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ca, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Malibu Media, LLC without prejudice (Schulz, Mary)
April 10, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference #8 is granted. Plaintiff must issue the subpoena within 3 days of this order. The information requested in the subpoena shall be limited to: name, address, telephone number, email address and Media Access Control number (the Information). Once produced, the Information shall be maintained as confidential by Plaintiff and Plaintiffs counsel for a period of not less than 30 days. Additionally, once the Information is produced, Plaintiffs counsel is directed to provide the person identified by the Information with a copy of this order via overnight delivery within two business days of its production. The person so identified shall be given leave to file an objection to the public disclosure of the Information within 21 days of the receipt of the Information and this order. Plaintiffs motion to amend the complaint to identify a Defendant by name, if any, is due 7 days after the expiration of the 30-day period of confidentiality. If no motion to amend the complaint is filed, the Court will assume that Plaintiff no longer wishes to pursue this action, and the case will be dismissed without prejudice. The status hearing set for 5/23/19 is reset to 7/23/19 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff is ordered to file a status report no later than two days before the next status hearing. In the status report, counsel for Plaintiff shall certify: (1) the date that the subpoena was issued to the ISP, (2) the date that the Information was received by Plaintiffs counsel, and (3) the date that the Information and a copy of this order was provided to the Defendants. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #8 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCfor early discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE MIDP complaince (Schulz, Mary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 5/23/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: #1 exhibits)(las, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
March 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15609703. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 65.119.181.2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?