Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 73.111.228.162
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 73.111.228.162
Case Number: 1:2019cv01895
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the filing of the notice of dismissal #14 , this case is dismissed without prejudice. All pending deadlines and hearings are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gel, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Malibu Media, LLC without prejudice (Schulz, Mary)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 6/12/2019 and continued to 7/30/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The initial status conference previously set for 5/2/19 is stricken and reset for 6/12/19 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motion for leave to serve third party subpoena prior to Rule 26(f) conference #7 is granted. Such early discovery is generally allowed only under limited circumstances. See, e.g., Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d); Dallas Buyers Club, LLC v. Does 1-28, No. 14 C 4927, 2014 WL 3642163, at *2 (N.D. Ill. July 22, 2014). Here, the Court finds that good cause exists to allow Plaintiff to obtain discovery prior to the conference. Plaintiff may cause to be issued a subpoena to the ISP that provided internet service to the defendant identified by the referenced IP address in order to obtain information regarding that defendant's name and address. This order is without prejudice to the defendant or ISP moving to quash the subpoena on any available ground. The 4/30/19 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS Report by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 4/30/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCfor early discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP Standing Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 5/2/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 4/22/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(pk, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
March 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15609762. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 73.111.228.162
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 73.111.228.162
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?