Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 67.175.64.176
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 67.175.64.176
Case Number: 1:2019cv01956
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: #1 Certified Closing Order) (tt, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Joint motion for dismissal with prejudice conditioned on court retaining jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the parties' confidential settlement agreement and incorporated memorandum of law #10 is granted. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (vcf, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 6/18/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 6/18/2019 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein.Mailed notice (vcf, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion for leave to serve a third party subpeona prior to Rule 26(f) conference #5 is granted. Motion hearing set for 4/11/2019 is stricken, no appearance is required. Mailed notice (vcf, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #5 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 4/11/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCfor early discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A & B).(smm, )
March 21, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15621282. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 67.175.64.176
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 67.175.64.176
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?