Service Corporation International et al v. Stericycle, Inc.
Plaintiff: S.E. Cemeteries Of Virginia, LLC, H. Samson, Inc., Alderwoods (West Virginia), Inc., Catawba Memorial Park, LLC, S.E. Cemeteries Of Louisiana, LLC, Alderwoods (Indiana), Inc., Alderwoods (Montana), Inc., ZS Acquisition, Inc., Alderwoods (North Carolina), LLC, The Parkwood Cemetery Company, S.E. Combined Services Of Texas, Inc., Haisten Funeral Home Of Henry County, Inc., Nineteen Thirty- Five Holdings, Inc., Chicago Cemetary Corporation, Lake View Memorial Gardens, Inc., Fort Lincoln Cemetery, LLC, S.E. Combined Services Of California, Inc., Alderwoods (Ohio) Funeral Home, Inc., Alderwoods (Maryland), Inc., Cuffe-McGinn Funeral Home, Inc., S.E. Acquisition Of Malden, West Virginia, Inc., Alderwoods (New York), LLC, S.E. Acquisition Of Pennsylvania, Inc., Clinch Valley Memorial Cemetary, Inc., Alderwoods (Minnesota), LLC, Emerald Hills Funeral Corporation, S.E. Cemeteries Of Florida, LLC, Klingel-Carpenter Mortuary, Inc., Alderwoods (Chicago Central), Inc., Ernest A. Richardson Funeral Home, Inc., Hillcrest Memorial Cemetery, Inc., S.E. Funeral Homes Of Florida, LLC, Alderwoods (Ohio) Cemetery Management, Inc., S.E. Funeral Homes Of West Virginia, Inc., Alderwoods (Oklahoma), Inc., Keystone Kentucky, Inc., S.E. Combined Services Of Alabama, LLC, The Nashville Historic Cemetery Association, LLC, Monte Vista Burial Park, LLC, S.E. Funeral Homes Of South Carolina, Inc., S.E. Cemeteries Of North Carolina, LLC, Alderwoods (Kansas), Inc., HHFP, Inc., Keystone America, Inc., National Harmony Memorial Park, Inc., The Schimunek Funeral Home Of Bel Air, Inc., Alderwoods (Idaho), Inc., Alderwoods (Tennessee), LLC, Alderwoods (Illinois), LLC, Kirk & Nice, Inc., Orion C. Pinkerton Funeral Home, Inc., Alderwoods (New Mexico), Inc., Nickerson-Bourne Funeral Homes, Inc., Alderwoods (Georgia), LLC, Sunset Hills Memorial Park, Carothers Holding Company, LLC, Pasadena Funeral Home, Inc., Alderwoods (Colorado), Inc., S.E. Funeral Homes Of Louisiana, LLC, Alleva Funeral Home, Inc., Fort Lincoln Funeral Homes, LLC, Knee Funeral Home Of Wilkinsburg, Inc., Dunwood Cemetery Service Company, S.E. Cemeteries Of South Carolina, Inc., Lineberry Group, LLC, Keystone Michigan, Inc., Universal Memorial Centers V., Inc., Hines-Rinaldi Funeral Home, LLC, Schimunek Funeral Home, Inc., Rose Haven Funeral Home & Cemetery, Inc., Ruzich Funeral Home, Inc., Reese Funeral Home, Inc., Alderwoods Group, LLC, Kirk & Nice Suburban Chapel, Inc., Lakewood Memorial Park, LLC, Alderwoods (Nevada), Inc., RH Cemetery Corp., Alderwoods (Connecticut), Inc., Druid Ridge Cemetery Company, Parklawn, Inc., Ogrodnik-Hahn Funeral Home, Inc., S.E. Cemeteries Of West Virginia, Inc., Forest Hills Cemetary, LLC, Chapel Of The Roses, Inc., Alderwoods (Washington), LLC, S&H Properties And Enterprises, Inc., Cheatham Hill Memorial Park, Inc., Casdorph & Curry Funeral Home, Inc., Oak Woods Management Company, Rose Hills Company, Holly Haven Funeral Home & Cemetery, Inc., Dunbar Funeral Home, Alderwoods (Oregon), Inc., Bartlett- Burdette-Cox Funeral Home, Inc., Neill Funeral Home, Inc., Westminster Gardens, Inc., Rest Hills Memorial Park, Inc., Stewart Enterprises, Inc., H.P. Brandt Funeral Home, Inc., Eastlawn Corporation, Burton L. Hirsch Funeral Home, Inc., Sunset Memorial Park Company, J.P. Finley And Son Mortuary, Inc., Waco Memorial Park, Inc., Crest Lawn Cemetery Gardens, LLC, S.E. Combined Services Of South Carolina, Inc., Pineview Memorial Park, Inc., LOI Charleston, Inc., Oak Woods Cemetery Association, S.E. Funeral Home Of Illinois, Inc., Heard Funeral Home, Inc., Simple Tribute Of Maryland, Inc., Healy-Hahn Funeral Home, Inc., George Washington Memorial Park, Inc., Vancouver Funeral Home And Cemetery, Inc., Alderwoods Group (California), Inc., Woodlawn Cemetery Of Chicago, Inc., West Lawn Cemetery, D.W. Newcomer's Sons, Inc., Bennett-Emmert-Szakovits Funeral Home, Inc., S.E. Funeral Homes Of Tennessee, Inc., Wlson Funeral Home, Inc., S.E. Funeral Home Of Coppell, Texas, Inc., S.E. Combined Services Of Florida, LLC, S.E. Funeral Homes Of North Carolina, Inc., St. Laurent Funeral Home, Inc., S.E. Cemeteries Of Texas, Inc., S.E. Funeral Homes Of California, Inc., S.E. Funeral Homes Of Arkansas, LLC, Reeves, Inc., Bright Undertaking Company, The Lincoln Memorial Park Cemetery Association, Alderwoods (Arkansas), Inc., S.E. Funeral Homes Of Virginia, LLC E.R. Butterworth & Sons, Service Corporation International, Ridgewood Cemetery Company, Inc., Mount Auburn Memorial Park, Inc., Alderwoods (Wisconsin), Inc., Alderwoods (Massachusetts), LLC, S.E. Combined Services Of Tennessee, LLC., RH Mortuary Corporation, S.E. Funeral Home Of Texas, Inc., Garrett-Hilcrest, LLC, Elmwood Acquisition Corporation, Loudon Park Funeral Home, Inc., S.E. Funeral Homes Of Alabama, LLC, Zarro Funeral Home, Alderwodds (Missouri), LLC, Alderwoods (Chicago North), Inc., Healy-Hahn Funeral Properties, Inc., John M. Taylor Funeral Home, LLC Loudon Park Cemetery Company, Chapel Of The Valley Funeral Home, Inc., McLaurin's Funeral Home, LLC, Woodlawn Memorial Park, Inc., Doane Beal & Ames, Inc., Graceland Cemetery Development Co., Cedar Hill Cemetery Company, LLC, Green Service Corporation, Montlawn Memorial Park, Inc., Lake Lawn Park, LLC, S.E. Cemeteries Of Wisconsin, Inc., E.R. Butterworth & Sons, Bounds Funeral Home, LLC, Behm Funeral Home, Inc., S.E. Cemetaries Of Alabama, LLC, Behm Funeral Properties, Inc., McHugh Funeral Home, Inc. and Alderwoods (Michigan), LLC
Defendant: Stericycle, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01960
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Status hearing set for 7/9/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Parties' Joint Motion to Stay pending settlement negotiations #29 is granted in part. Case stayed until 9/30/2019. Status Report due by 7/30/2019 regarding progress of settlement negotiations. Motion hearing set for 6/17/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 31 Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Service Corporation International (Webb, William)
May 31, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen Patricia Lally for presentment of motion to stay #29 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/17/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Lally, Kathleen)
May 31, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION by Defendant Stericycle, Inc. to stay - Joint Motion to Stay Pending Settlement Negotiations (Unopposed) (Lally, Kathleen)
May 10, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorney Troy Ford's Motion to appear pro hac vice #24 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
May 10, 2019 Filing 27 First AMENDED complaint by Service Corporation International against Stericycle, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3)(Webb, William)
May 9, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED Complaint and Jury Demand (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3)(Webb, William)
May 9, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15808449. (Ford, Troy)
May 9, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorney William Webb's Motion to appear pro hac vice #22 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial Status hearing held on 5/8/2019. Plaintiffs' oral motion to file an amended complaint is granted. Amended Complaint shall be filed by 5/10/2019. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #17 is stricken with leave to be refiled by 5/31/2019. End of Fact Discovery ordered closed by 1/31/2020. End of Fact Discovery Status hearing set for 2/3/2020 at 9:00 AM. The parties shall be prepared to report to the court whether expert discovery is necessary. Parties are directed to contact the courtroom deputy by 11/15/2019 to inform the Court if they are requesting a referral to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of a settlement conference.M.Mailed notice (lk, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15803307. (Webb, William)
May 3, 2019 Filing 21 STATUS Report by Alderwodds (Missouri), LLC, Alderwoods (Arkansas), Inc., Alderwoods (Chicago Central), Inc., Alderwoods (Chicago North), Inc., Alderwoods (Colorado), Inc., Alderwoods (Connecticut), Inc., Alderwoods (Georgia), LLC, Alderwoods (Idaho), Inc., Alderwoods (Illinois), LLC, Alderwoods (Indiana), Inc., Alderwoods (Kansas), Inc., Alderwoods (Maryland), Inc., Alderwoods (Massachusetts), LLC, Alderwoods (Michigan), LLC, Alderwoods (Minnesota), LLC, Alderwoods (Montana), Inc., Alderwoods (Nevada), Inc., Alderwoods (New Mexico), Inc., Alderwoods (New York), LLC, Alderwoods (North Carolina), LLC, Alderwoods (Ohio) Cemetery Management, Inc., Alderwoods (Ohio) Funeral Home, Inc., Alderwoods (Oklahoma), Inc., Alderwoods (Oregon), Inc., Alderwoods (Tennessee), LLC, Alderwoods (Washington), LLC, Alderwoods (West Virginia), Inc., Alderwoods (Wisconsin), Inc., Alderwoods Group (California), Inc., Alderwoods Group, LLC, Alleva Funeral Home, Inc., Bartlett- Burdette-Cox Funeral Home, Inc., Behm Funeral Home, Inc., Behm Funeral Properties, Inc., Bennett-Emmert-Szakovits Funeral Home, Inc., Bounds Funeral Home, LLC, Bright Undertaking Company, Burton L. Hirsch Funeral Home, Inc., Carothers Holding Company, LLC, Casdorph & Curry Funeral Home, Inc., Catawba Memorial Park, LLC, Cedar Hill Cemetery Company, LLC, Chapel Of The Roses, Inc., Chapel Of The Valley Funeral Home, Inc., Cheatham Hill Memorial Park, Inc., Chicago Cemetary Corporation, Clinch Valley Memorial Cemetary, Inc., Crest Lawn Cemetery Gardens, LLC, Cuffe-McGinn Funeral Home, Inc., D.W. Newcomer's Sons, Inc., Doane Beal & Ames, Inc., Druid Ridge Cemetery Company, Dunbar Funeral Home, Dunwood Cemetery Service Company, E.R. Butterworth & Sons, Eastlawn Corporation, Elmwood Acquisition Corporation, Emerald Hills Funeral Corporation, Ernest A. Richardson Funeral Home, Inc., Forest Hills Cemetary, LLC, Fort Lincoln Cemetery, LLC, Fort Lincoln Funeral Homes, LLC, Garrett-Hilcrest, LLC, George Washington Memorial Park, Inc., Graceland Cemetery Development Co., Green Service Corporation, H. Samson, Inc., H.P. Brandt Funeral Home, Inc., HHFP, Inc., Haisten Funeral Home Of Henry County, Inc., Healy-Hahn Funeral Home, Inc., Healy-Hahn Funeral Properties, Inc., Heard Funeral Home, Inc., Hillcrest Memorial Cemetery, Inc., Hines-Rinaldi Funeral Home, LLC, Holly Haven Funeral Home & Cemetery, Inc., J.P. Finley And Son Mortuary, Inc., John M. Taylor Funeral Home, LLC Loudon Park Cemetery Company, Keystone America, Inc., Keystone Kentucky, Inc., Keystone Michigan, Inc., Kirk & Nice Suburban Chapel, Inc., Kirk & Nice, Inc., Klingel-Carpenter Mortuary, Inc., Knee Funeral Home Of Wilkinsburg, Inc., LOI Charleston, Inc., Lake Lawn Park, LLC, Lake View Memorial Gardens, Inc., Lakewood Memorial Park, LLC, Lineberry Group, LLC, Loudon Park Funeral Home, Inc., McHugh Funeral Home, Inc., McLaurin's Funeral Home, LLC, Monte Vista Burial Park, LLC, Montlawn Memorial Park, Inc., Mount Auburn Memorial Park, Inc., National Harmony Memorial Park, Inc., Neill Funeral Home, Inc., Nickerson-Bourne Funeral Homes, Inc., Nineteen Thirty- Five Holdings, Inc., Oak Woods Cemetery Association, Oak Woods Management Company, Ogrodnik-Hahn Funeral Home, Inc., Orion C. Pinkerton Funeral Home, Inc., Parklawn, Inc., Pasadena Funeral Home, Inc., Pineview Memorial Park, Inc., RH Cemetery Corp., RH Mortuary Corporation, Reese Funeral Home, Inc., Reeves, Inc., Rest Hills Memorial Park, Inc., Ridgewood Cemetery Company, Inc., Rose Haven Funeral Home & Cemetery, Inc., Rose Hills Company, Ruzich Funeral Home, Inc., S&H Properties And Enterprises, Inc., S.E. Acquisition Of Malden, West Virginia, Inc., S.E. Acquisition Of Pennsylvania, Inc., S.E. Cemetaries Of Alabama, LLC, S.E. Cemeteries Of Florida, LLC, S.E. Cemeteries Of Louisiana, LLC, S.E. Cemeteries Of North Carolina, LLC, S.E. Cemeteries Of South Carolina, Inc., S.E. Cemeteries Of Texas, Inc., S.E. Cemeteries Of Virginia, LLC, S.E. Cemeteries Of West Virginia, Inc., S.E. Cemeteries Of Wisconsin, Inc., S.E. Combined Services Of Alabama, LLC, S.E. Combined Services Of California, Inc., S.E. Combined Services Of Florida, LLC, S.E. Combined Services Of South Carolina, Inc., S.E. Combined Services Of Tennessee, LLC., S.E. Combined Services Of Texas, Inc., S.E. Funeral Home Of Coppell, Texas, Inc., S.E. Funeral Home Of Illinois, Inc., S.E. Funeral Home Of Texas, Inc., S.E. Funeral Homes Of Alabama, LLC, S.E. Funeral Homes Of Arkansas, LLC, S.E. Funeral Homes Of California, Inc., S.E. Funeral Homes Of Florida, LLC, S.E. Funeral Homes Of Louisiana, LLC, S.E. Funeral Homes Of North Carolina, Inc., S.E. Funeral Homes Of South Carolina, Inc., S.E. Funeral Homes Of Tennessee, Inc., S.E. Funeral Homes Of Virginia, LLC E.R. Butterworth & Sons, S.E. Funeral Homes Of West Virginia, Inc., Schimunek Funeral Home, Inc., Service Corporation International, Simple Tribute Of Maryland, Inc., St. Laurent Funeral Home, Inc. (Stephan, Ryan)
April 26, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Briefing schedule set as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #17 . Response due by 5/10/2019. Reply due by 5/17/2019. Status Hearing set for 7/9/2019 at 9:00 AM. Initial Status hearing set for 5/8/2019 at 9:00 AM stands. Motion hearing set for 4/29/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen Patricia Lally for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #17 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/29/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Lally, Kathleen)
April 22, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Stericycle, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #17 (Lally, Kathleen)
April 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Stericycle, Inc. (Lally, Kathleen)
April 17, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Service Corporation International by Haley Renee Jenkins (Jenkins, Haley)
April 17, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Unopposed Motion to reset Initial Status hearing #12 is granted. Initial Status hearing set for 5/8/2019 at 9:00 AM. Motion hearing set for 4/18/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Alderwodds (Missouri), LLC, Alderwoods (Arkansas), Inc., Alderwoods (Chicago Central), Inc., Alderwoods (Chicago North), Inc., Alderwoods (Colorado), Inc., Alderwoods (Connecticut), Inc., Alderwoods (Georgia), LLC, Alderwoods (Idaho), Inc., Alderwoods (Illinois), LLC, Alderwoods (Indiana), Inc., Alderwoods (Kansas), Inc., Alderwoods (Maryland), Inc., Alderwoods (Massachusetts), LLC, Alderwoods (Michigan), LLC, Alderwoods (Minnesota), LLC, Alderwoods (Montana), Inc., Alderwoods (Nevada), Inc., Alderwoods (New Mexico), Inc., Alderwoods (New York), LLC, Alderwoods (North Carolina), LLC, Alderwoods (Ohio) Cemetery Management, Inc., Alderwoods (Ohio) Funeral Home, Inc., Alderwoods (Oklahoma), Inc., Alderwoods (Oregon), Inc., Alderwoods (Tennessee), LLC, Alderwoods (Washington), LLC, Alderwoods (West Virginia), Inc., Alderwoods (Wisconsin), Inc., Alderwoods Group (California), Inc., Alderwoods Group, LLC, Alleva Funeral Home, Inc., Bartlett- Burdette-Cox Funeral Home, Inc., Behm Funeral Home, Inc., Behm Funeral Properties, Inc., Bennett-Emmert-Szakovits Funeral Home, Inc., Bounds Funeral Home, LLC, Bright Undertaking Company, Burton L. Hirsch Funeral Home, Inc., Carothers Holding Company, LLC, Casdorph & Curry Funeral Home, Inc., Catawba Memorial Park, LLC, Cedar Hill Cemetery Company, LLC, Chapel Of The Roses, Inc., Chapel Of The Valley Funeral Home, Inc., Cheatham Hill Memorial Park, Inc., Chicago Cemetary Corporation, Clinch Valley Memorial Cemetary, Inc., Crest Lawn Cemetery Gardens, LLC, Cuffe-McGinn Funeral Home, Inc., D.W. Newcomer's Sons, Inc., Doane Beal & Ames, Inc., Druid Ridge Cemetery Company, Dunbar Funeral Home, Dunwood Cemetery Service Company, E.R. Butterworth & Sons, Eastlawn Corporation, Elmwood Acquisition Corporation, Emerald Hills Funeral Corporation, Ernest A. Richardson Funeral Home, Inc., Forest Hills Cemetary, LLC, Fort Lincoln Cemetery, LLC, Fort Lincoln Funeral Homes, LLC, Garrett-Hilcrest, LLC, George Washington Memorial Park, Inc., Graceland Cemetery Development Co., Green Service Corporation, H. Samson, Inc., H.P. Brandt Funeral Home, Inc., HHFP, Inc., Haisten Funeral Home Of Henry County, Inc., Healy-Hahn Funeral Home, Inc., Healy-Hahn Funeral Properties, Inc., Heard Funeral Home, Inc., Hillcrest Memorial Cemetery, Inc., Hillcrest Memorial Cemetery, Inc., Hines-Rinaldi Funeral Home, LLC, Hines-Rinaldi Funeral Home, LLC, Holly Haven Funeral Home & Cemetery, Inc., J.P. Finley And Son Mortuary, Inc., John M. Taylor Funeral Home, LLC Loudon Park Cemetery Company, Keystone America, Inc., Keystone Kentucky, Inc., Keystone Michigan, Inc., Kirk & Nice Suburban Chapel, Inc., Kirk & Nice, Inc., Klingel-Carpenter Mortuary, Inc., Knee Funeral Home Of Wilkinsburg, Inc., LOI Charleston, Inc., Lake Lawn Park, LLC, Lake View Memorial Gardens, Inc., Lakewood Memorial Park, LLC, Lineberry Group, LLC, Loudon Park Funeral Home, Inc., McHugh Funeral Home, Inc., McLaurin's Funeral Home, LLC, Monte Vista Burial Park, LLC, Montlawn Memorial Park, Inc., Montlawn Memorial Park, Inc., Mount Auburn Memorial Park, Inc., National Harmony Memorial Park, Inc., Neill Funeral Home, Inc., Nickerson-Bourne Funeral Homes, Inc., Nineteen Thirty- Five Holdings, Inc., Oak Woods Cemetery Association, Oak Woods Management Company, Ogrodnik-Hahn Funeral Home, Inc., Orion C. Pinkerton Funeral Home, Inc., Parklawn, Inc., Pasadena Funeral Home, Inc., Pineview Memorial Park, Inc., RH Cemetery Corp., RH Mortuary Corporation, Reese Funeral Home, Inc., Reeves, Inc., Rest Hills Memorial Park, Inc., Ridgewood Cemetery Company, Inc., Rose Haven Funeral Home & Cemetery, Inc., Rose Hills Company, Ruzich Funeral Home, Inc., S&H Properties And Enterprises, Inc., S.E. Acquisition Of Malden, West Virginia, Inc., S.E. Acquisition Of Pennsylvania, Inc., S.E. Cemetaries Of Alabama, LLC, S.E. Cemeteries Of Florida, LLC, S.E. Cemeteries Of Louisiana, LLC, S.E. Cemeteries Of North Carolina, LLC, S.E. Cemeteries Of South Carolina, Inc., S.E. Cemeteries Of Texas, Inc., S.E. Cemeteries Of Virginia, LLC, S.E. Cemeteries Of West Virginia, Inc., S.E. Cemeteries Of Wisconsin, Inc., S.E. Combined Services Of Alabama, LLC, S.E. Combined Services Of California, Inc., S.E. Combined Services Of Florida, LLC, S.E. Combined Services Of South Carolina, Inc., S.E. Combined Services Of Tennessee, LLC., S.E. Combined Services Of Texas, Inc., S.E. Funeral Home Of Coppell, Texas, Inc., S.E. Funeral Home Of Illinois, Inc., S.E. Funeral Home Of Texas, Inc., S.E. Funeral Homes Of Alabama, LLC, S.E. Funeral Homes Of Arkansas, LLC, S.E. Funeral Homes Of California, Inc., S.E. Funeral Homes Of Florida, LLC, S.E. Funeral Homes Of Louisiana, LLC, S.E. Funeral Homes Of North Carolina, Inc., S.E. Funeral Homes Of South Carolina, Inc., S.E. Funeral Homes Of Tennessee, Inc., S.E. Funeral Homes Of Virginia, LLC E.R. Butterworth & Sons, S.E. Funeral Homes Of West Virginia, Inc., Schimunek Funeral Home, Inc., Service Corporation International, Simple Tribute Of Maryland, Inc., St. Laurent Funeral Home, Inc., Stewart Enterprises, Inc., Sunset Hills Memorial Park, Sunset Memorial Park Company, The Lincoln Memorial Park Cemetery Association, The Nashville Historic Cemetery Association, LLC, The Parkwood Cemetery Company, The Schimunek Funeral Home Of Bel Air, Inc., Universal Memorial Centers V., Inc., Vancouver Funeral Home And Cemetery, Inc., Waco Memorial Park, Inc., West Lawn Cemetery, Westminster Gardens, Inc., Wlson Funeral Home, Inc., Woodlawn Cemetery Of Chicago, Inc., Woodlawn Memorial Park, Inc., ZS Acquisition, Inc., Zarro Funeral Home by James B. Zouras (Zouras, James)
April 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen Patricia Lally for presentment of motion to reset #12 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Lally, Kathleen)
April 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Stericycle, Inc. to reset initial status conference - Unopposed (Lally, Kathleen)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry (Corrected) before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #8 is granted. Answer shall be filed by 4/22/2019. Joint Status Report due by 4/25/2019. Initial Status hearing set for 4/30/2019 at 9:00 AM. Motion hearing set for 4/1/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice. PDF not attached to initial entry. Mailed notice (lk, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendant's Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #8 is granted. Answer shall be filed by 4/22/2019. Joint Status Report due by 4/25/2019. Initial Status hearing set for 4/30/2019 at 9:00 AM. Motion hearing set for 4/1/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen Patricia Lally for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/1/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Lally, Kathleen)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Stericycle, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint - Unopposed (Lally, Kathleen)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (bg, )
March 21, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Stericycle, Inc. (Lally, Kathleen)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Stericycle, Inc. by Kathleen Patricia Lally (Lally, Kathleen)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Stericycle, Inc. by Mark Steven Mester (Mester, Mark)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lally, Kathleen)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (19 CH 01546) filed by Stericycle, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15622135. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List and Exhibits 1 - 4)(Lally, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Service Corporation International et al v. Stericycle, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Cemeteries Of Virginia, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. Samson, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (West Virginia), Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catawba Memorial Park, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Cemeteries Of Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Indiana), Inc.
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Montana), Inc.
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZS Acquisition, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (North Carolina), LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Parkwood Cemetery Company
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Combined Services Of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haisten Funeral Home Of Henry County, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nineteen Thirty- Five Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago Cemetary Corporation
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake View Memorial Gardens, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Lincoln Cemetery, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Combined Services Of California, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Ohio) Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Maryland), Inc.
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cuffe-McGinn Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Acquisition Of Malden, West Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (New York), LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Acquisition Of Pennsylvania, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinch Valley Memorial Cemetary, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Minnesota), LLC
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emerald Hills Funeral Corporation
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Cemeteries Of Florida, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Klingel-Carpenter Mortuary, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Chicago Central), Inc.
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest A. Richardson Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillcrest Memorial Cemetery, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Funeral Homes Of Florida, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Ohio) Cemetery Management, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Funeral Homes Of West Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Oklahoma), Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keystone Kentucky, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Combined Services Of Alabama, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Nashville Historic Cemetery Association, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monte Vista Burial Park, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Funeral Homes Of South Carolina, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Cemeteries Of North Carolina, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Kansas), Inc.
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HHFP, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keystone America, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Harmony Memorial Park, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Schimunek Funeral Home Of Bel Air, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Idaho), Inc.
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Tennessee), LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Illinois), LLC
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk & Nice, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orion C. Pinkerton Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (New Mexico), Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nickerson-Bourne Funeral Homes, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Georgia), LLC
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunset Hills Memorial Park
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carothers Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pasadena Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Colorado), Inc.
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Funeral Homes Of Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alleva Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fort Lincoln Funeral Homes, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Knee Funeral Home Of Wilkinsburg, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dunwood Cemetery Service Company
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Cemeteries Of South Carolina, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lineberry Group, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keystone Michigan, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Memorial Centers V., Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hines-Rinaldi Funeral Home, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schimunek Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Haven Funeral Home & Cemetery, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruzich Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reese Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods Group, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk & Nice Suburban Chapel, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakewood Memorial Park, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Nevada), Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RH Cemetery Corp.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Connecticut), Inc.
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Druid Ridge Cemetery Company
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parklawn, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ogrodnik-Hahn Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Cemeteries Of West Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forest Hills Cemetary, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chapel Of The Roses, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Washington), LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S&H Properties And Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheatham Hill Memorial Park, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casdorph & Curry Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oak Woods Management Company
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Hills Company
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Haven Funeral Home & Cemetery, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dunbar Funeral Home
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Oregon), Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bartlett- Burdette-Cox Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neill Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westminster Gardens, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rest Hills Memorial Park, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stewart Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.P. Brandt Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eastlawn Corporation
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burton L. Hirsch Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunset Memorial Park Company
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.P. Finley And Son Mortuary, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waco Memorial Park, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crest Lawn Cemetery Gardens, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Combined Services Of South Carolina, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pineview Memorial Park, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOI Charleston, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oak Woods Cemetery Association
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Funeral Home Of Illinois, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heard Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simple Tribute Of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healy-Hahn Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Washington Memorial Park, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vancouver Funeral Home And Cemetery, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods Group (California), Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodlawn Cemetery Of Chicago, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Lawn Cemetery
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.W. Newcomer's Sons, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennett-Emmert-Szakovits Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Funeral Homes Of Tennessee, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wlson Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Funeral Home Of Coppell, Texas, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Combined Services Of Florida, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Funeral Homes Of North Carolina, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Laurent Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Cemeteries Of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Funeral Homes Of California, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Funeral Homes Of Arkansas, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reeves, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bright Undertaking Company
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Lincoln Memorial Park Cemetery Association
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Arkansas), Inc.
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Funeral Homes Of Virginia, LLC E.R. Butterworth & Sons
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Service Corporation International
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: Troy Ray Ford
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: William Curtis Webb
Represented By: Haley Renee Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ridgewood Cemetery Company, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mount Auburn Memorial Park, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Wisconsin), Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Massachusetts), LLC
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Combined Services Of Tennessee, LLC.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RH Mortuary Corporation
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Funeral Home Of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrett-Hilcrest, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmwood Acquisition Corporation
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loudon Park Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Funeral Homes Of Alabama, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zarro Funeral Home
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwodds (Missouri), LLC
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Chicago North), Inc.
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healy-Hahn Funeral Properties, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Taylor Funeral Home, LLC Loudon Park Cemetery Company
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chapel Of The Valley Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McLaurin's Funeral Home, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodlawn Memorial Park, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doane Beal & Ames, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graceland Cemetery Development Co.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedar Hill Cemetery Company, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Service Corporation
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montlawn Memorial Park, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake Lawn Park, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Cemeteries Of Wisconsin, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.R. Butterworth & Sons
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bounds Funeral Home, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Behm Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.E. Cemetaries Of Alabama, LLC
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Behm Funeral Properties, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McHugh Funeral Home, Inc.
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alderwoods (Michigan), LLC
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stericycle, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Steven Mester
Represented By: Kathleen Patricia Lally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?