N.Neville Reid not individually et al v. Wolf
Plaintiff: N.Neville Reid not individually et al and N. Neville Reid
Defendant: Michael Wolf, Scott Wolf, Hound Ventures, Inc., ZZC, Inc. (DE), ZZC, Inc. (IL), Four Legs, Inc., Melissa Skolnick, SHBM, Inc., Peter Wolf, Ma Cherie LLC, MMQB, Inc. and Zig-Zag, Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01978
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff N. Neville Reid by Daniel Patrick Dawson (Dawson, Daniel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Appellee's motion for extension of time to file response 30 (case 18cv7952) is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Appellee's briefs due 7/26/19. The other deadlines set by this Courts order dated 4/23/19 27 are stricken. Replies to the Opening Briefs and Response to the Trustee's opening cross-appeal brief are now due by August 21, 2019 and Reply Brief on the Trustee's cross-appeal is due by September 4, 2019. Mailed notice (air, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF in Opposition to the Bankruptcy Court's proposed Finding of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Scott Wolf. (gcy, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held. The appeal briefing schedule is as follows. Due by June 7, 2018: Opening brief of Appellants' Michael Wolf and Peter Wolf (joint brief) in Case No. 18-7952; Opening brief of Appellant Scott Wolf in Case No. 18-7953; Opening brief of Scott Wolf in opposition to the Bankruptcy Court's proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law in Case No. 19-1978 (collectively, "the Opening Briefs"). Due by July 12, 2019: Response briefs to the Opening Briefs; Trustee's opening brief on cross-appeal in 18-7952. Due by August 7, 2019: Replies to the Opening Briefs; Response to the Trustee's opening cross-appeal brief. Due by August 21, 2019: Reply brief on the Trustee's cross-appeal. If required, the Court will set oral argument upon review of the briefs; otherwise, the Court will rule by CM/ECF notice. Mailed notice (air, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:A status hearing for the purpose of setting a consolidated briefing schedule in appeals 18-7952, 18-7953, and 19-1978 will be held on Tuesday, April 23, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 MAILED Rule 83.16 letter with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (kp, )
March 22, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (yt)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to findings of fact #1 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(USBC-Green, )
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 PROPOSED FINDINGS of fact and conclusions of law from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 16 A 00066 (Judge Thorne) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(USBC-Green, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N.Neville Reid not individually et al v. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hound Ventures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZZC, Inc. (DE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZZC, Inc. (IL)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Legs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Skolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHBM, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ma Cherie LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMQB, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zig-Zag, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.Neville Reid not individually et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. Neville Reid
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?