Bey v. U.S. Bank et al
Plaintiff: Nazir Jabali Bey
Defendant: Yusuf I Mehdi, Kimberly J. Harris, Craig D. Schnuck, Elizabeth L Buse, Doreen Woo Ho, O'dell M. Owens, Karen S Lynch, Warner Baxter, Olivia F. Kirtley, Arthur D. Collins, Jr., Roland A Hernandez, Dorothy Bridges, Richard P McKenny, Andrew Cecere, Marc N. Casper, David B. O'Maley, Scott W Wine and U.S. Bank, National Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv02024
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the status hearing set for 5/30/19 is reset to 7/31/19 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS Report (Initial) by Warner Baxter, Dorothy Bridges, Elizabeth L Buse, Marc N. Casper, Andrew Cecere, Arthur D. Collins, Jr, Kimberly J. Harris, Roland A Hernandez, Olivia F. Kirtley, Karen S Lynch, Richard P McKenny, Yusuf I Mehdi, David B. O'Maley, O'dell M. Owens, Craig D. Schnuck, U.S. Bank, National Association, Scott W Wine, Doreen Woo Ho (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bey Status Report)(Sawyer, Ryan)
May 21, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY by Defendants Warner Baxter, Dorothy Bridges, Elizabeth L Buse, Marc N. Casper, Andrew Cecere, Arthur D. Collins, Jr, Kimberly J. Harris, Roland A Hernandez, Olivia F. Kirtley, Karen S Lynch, Richard P McKenny, Yusuf I Mehdi, David B. O'Maley, O'dell M. Owens, Craig D. Schnuck, U.S. Bank, National Association, Scott W Wine, Doreen Woo Ho in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Sawyer, Ryan)
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Warner Baxter, Dorothy Bridges, Elizabeth L Buse, Marc N. Casper, Andrew Cecere, Arthur D. Collins, Jr, Kimberly J. Harris, Roland A Hernandez, Olivia F. Kirtley, Karen S Lynch, Richard P McKenny, Yusuf I Mehdi, David B. O'Maley, O'dell M. Owens, Craig D. Schnuck, U.S. Bank, National Association, Scott W Wine, Doreen Woo Ho by Douglas R Sargent (Sargent, Douglas)
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Nazir Jabali Bey to the Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Exhbits). (lf, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss #10 shall be due by 5/10/19; reply due by 5/24/19. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 Certification by Attorney regarding Discovery Obligations under MIDP by Warner Baxter, Dorothy Bridges, Elizabeth L Buse, Marc N. Casper, Andrew Cecere, Andrew Cecere(U.S. Bank National Association Chairman President & Chief Executive Officer in his official capacity), Arthur D. Collins, Jr, Kimberly J. Harris, Roland A Hernandez, Olivia F. Kirtley, Karen S Lynch, Richard P McKenny, Yusuf I Mehdi, David B. O'Maley, O'dell M. Owens, Craig D. Schnuck, U.S. Bank, National Association, Scott W Wine, Doreen Woo Ho (Sawyer, Ryan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Ryan Aaron Sawyer for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #10 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 4/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Sawyer, Ryan)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Warner Baxter, Dorothy Bridges, Elizabeth L Buse, Marc N. Casper, Andrew Cecere, Andrew Cecere, Arthur D. Collins, Jr, Kimberly J. Harris, Roland A Hernandez, Olivia F. Kirtley, Karen S Lynch, Richard P McKenny, Yusuf I Mehdi, David B. O'Maley, O'dell M. Owens, Craig D. Schnuck, U.S. Bank, National Association, Scott W Wine, Doreen Woo Ho (Sawyer, Ryan)
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by U.S. Bank, National Association (Sawyer, Ryan)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Warner Baxter, Dorothy Bridges, Elizabeth L Buse, Marc N. Casper, Andrew Cecere, Andrew Cecere, Arthur D. Collins, Jr, Kimberly J. Harris, Roland A Hernandez, Olivia F. Kirtley, Karen S Lynch, Richard P McKenny, Yusuf I Mehdi, David B. O'Maley, O'dell M. Owens, Craig D. Schnuck, U.S. Bank, National Association, Scott W Wine, Doreen Woo Ho by Ryan Aaron Sawyer (Sawyer, Ryan)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 5/30/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
March 26, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Warner Baxter, Dorothy Bridges, Elizabeth L Buse, Marc N. Casper, Andrew Cecere, Arthur D. Collins, Jr, Kimberly J. Harris, Roland A Hernandez, Olivia F. Kirtley, Karen S Lynch, Richard P McKenny, Yusuf I Mehdi, David B. O'Maley, O'dell M. Owens, Craig D. Schnuck, Scott W Wine, Doreen Woo Ho (lma, )
March 26, 2019 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant U.S. Bank, National Association. (pj, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued two original and two copies as to Defendants Andrew Cecere, U.S. Bank, National Association (las, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Nazir Jabali Bey (las, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (las, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Nazir Jabali Bey; jury demand (Exhibits); Notice. (las, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bey v. U.S. Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yusuf I Mehdi
Represented By: Douglas R Sargent
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly J. Harris
Represented By: Douglas R Sargent
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig D. Schnuck
Represented By: Douglas R Sargent
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth L Buse
Represented By: Douglas R Sargent
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doreen Woo Ho
Represented By: Douglas R Sargent
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'dell M. Owens
Represented By: Douglas R Sargent
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen S Lynch
Represented By: Douglas R Sargent
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Baxter
Represented By: Douglas R Sargent
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivia F. Kirtley
Represented By: Douglas R Sargent
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur D. Collins, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas R Sargent
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland A Hernandez
Represented By: Douglas R Sargent
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Bridges
Represented By: Douglas R Sargent
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard P McKenny
Represented By: Douglas R Sargent
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Cecere
Represented By: Douglas R Sargent
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc N. Casper
Represented By: Douglas R Sargent
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. O'Maley
Represented By: Douglas R Sargent
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott W Wine
Represented By: Douglas R Sargent
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association
Represented By: Douglas R Sargent
Represented By: Ryan Aaron Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nazir Jabali Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?