Huron Consulting Group Inc. v. Gruner
Plaintiff: Huron Consulting Group Inc.
Defendant: Ronald Gruner
Case Number: 1:2019cv02039
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 21 JUDGMENT ORDER signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 6/21/2019. Mailed notice (cn).
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Given defendant Gruner's representation to the Court that he does not oppose plaintiff's petition to confirm the arbitration award, plaintiff's petition #1 is granted. Civil case terminated. Enter Judgment Order. Mailed notice (cn).
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Defendant's motion to file response to petition under seal #14 is granted. Mailed notice (cn).
June 18, 2019 Filing 18 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr for all further proceedings. Honorable Virginia M. Kendall no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/18/2019. (mma, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Case has been reassigned to the Honorable John J. Tharp. Executive Order will follow. Status hearing set before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/19/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 Public Redacted Version of ANSWER to Complaint by Ronald Gruner(Shapiro, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Ronald Gruner response to petition to confirm arbitration (Shapiro, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Ronald Gruner to seal response to petition to confirm arbitration (Shapiro, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Huron Consulting Group Inc. Motion to Reassign (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barber, Christopher)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ronald Gruner by Michael Samuel Shapiro (Shapiro, Michael)
April 10, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 6/19/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 6/13/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Complaint #4 is granted. Motion hearing set for 4/2/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, )
March 26, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Huron Consulting Group Inc. by Ashley Hyun-Jeong Kim (Kim, Ashley Hyun-Jeong)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE PARTY DISCLOSURE AND NOTIFICATION OF AFFILIATES STATEMENT by Huron Consulting Group Inc. (Barber, Christopher)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Huron Consulting Group Inc. PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barber, Christopher)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion by Christopher James Barber for presentment of motion to seal document #4 before Unassigned on 4/2/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Barber, Christopher)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Huron Consulting Group Inc. to seal document complaint #1 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (Barber, Christopher)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Barber, Christopher)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Huron Consulting Group Inc. by Christopher James Barber (Barber, Christopher)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD (Redacted Copy) filed by Huron Consulting Group Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15633756.(Barber, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huron Consulting Group Inc. v. Gruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huron Consulting Group Inc.
Represented By: Christopher James Barber
Represented By: Ashley Hyun-Jeong Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Gruner
Represented By: Michael Samuel Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?