Bank of New York Mellon, The v. Zielinski et al
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York and Bank of New York Mellon, The
Defendant: Nicole Zielinski, Dan Zielinski, Household Finance Corporation, Darlene N Payne, Bank of America National Association, U.S. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, Carrington Mortgage Services LLC and Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv02069
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon, The by Natalie Burris (Burris, Natalie)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Nicole Zielinski filed a petition for relief from judgment under 735 ILCS 5/2-1401(f) in the Circuit Court of DuPage County, Illinois, seeking to vacate as void the judgment and orders entered over ten years ago in a foreclosure proceeding, alleging that she was served with defective service. Zielinski's petition also requests restitution from various entities not parties to the foreclosure proceeding, including the United States Department of Housing and Urban Development ("HUD"), which allegedly obtained a mortgage on the foreclosed property six years after the judicial sale. HUD removed the petition to this court and both it and Bank of New York Mellon have moved to dismiss the petition. Zielinski was ordered to respond to the motions to dismiss by June 11, 2019. She has failed to do so or to request additional time, perhaps because there is little response to be made. Consequently, because petitioner has failed to respond to the pending motions to dismiss and because it appears both motions are meritorious, the court grants both motions [Docs. #17 , #20 ]. This matter remains set for a report on status on August 29, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/10/2019. Mailed notice (cn).
May 14, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 5/14/2019. Responses to the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development's motion to dismiss #17 and the Bank of New York Mellon's motion to dismiss Nicole Zielinski's petition to vacate #20 due by 6/11/2019, replies due by 6/25/2019. Bank of America, N.A.'s motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to the petition #20 is granted. Bank of America's responsive pleading due by 6/4/2019. Defendants Carrington Mortgage Services LLC and Darlene N. Reyes Payne's motion to stay deadlines for responsive pleadings #24 is granted. Status hearing set for 5/22/2019 is stricken and reset to 8/29/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
April 30, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Timothy Michael McLean for presentment of motion to stay #24 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/22/2019 at 09:10 AM. (McLean, Timothy)
April 30, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION by Defendants Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Darlene N Payne to stay deadlines for responsive pleadings (McLean, Timothy)
April 30, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Carrington Mortgage Services LLC, Darlene N Payne by Timothy Michael McLean (McLean, Timothy)
April 30, 2019 Filing 22 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Bank of New York Mellon, The (Pustilnik, David)
April 30, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by David F Pustilnik for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, motion for extension of time to file answer, #20 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/14/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Pustilnik, David)
April 30, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon, The , MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon, The for extension of time to file answer on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Note), #2 Exhibit B (Mortgage), #3 Exhibit C (Bankruptcy Petition), #4 Exhibit D (Statement of Financial Affairs))(Pustilnik, David)
April 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by David Harold DeCelles for presentment of motion to dismiss #17 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/14/2019 at 09:15 AM. (DeCelles, David)
April 30, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by U.S. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development in support of motion to dismiss #17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DeCelles, David)
April 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant U.S. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development to dismiss (DeCelles, David)
April 17, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 4/17/2019. Bank of New York Mellon's Motion to extend time for the Bank of New York Mellon and Bank of America, N.A. to answer or otherwise plead to petitioner Nicole Zielinski's petition for relief from void judgments, and to correct docket to allow appearance on behalf of respondent Bank of America, N.A. #13 is granted, in part. Bank of New York Mellon and Bank of America, N.A.'s responsive pleading due by 4/30/2019. The motion to correct the docket is entered and continued. Status hearing set for 5/22/2019 9:10 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development's unopposed motion of HUD to extend time to answer or otherwise plead #4 and Defendant Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC's unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise plead #10 are granted. Defendants' responsive pleadings due by 4/30/2019. Mailed notice (cn).
April 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by David F Pustilnik for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer,, motion for miscellaneous relief, #13 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/17/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Pustilnik, David)
April 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon, The for extension of time to file answer and Bank of America, N.A., MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon, The To Correct Docket To Allow Appearance on Behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Pustilnik, David)
April 9, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon, The by David F Pustilnik (Pustilnik, David)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Rebekah A Childers for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #10 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/10/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Childers, Rebekah)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Carrington Mortgage Services LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding notice of removal #1 DEFENDANT CARRINGTON'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD (Childers, Rebekah)
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Carrington Mortgage Services LLC CARRINGTON'S CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Childers, Rebekah)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Carrington Mortgage Services LLC by Rebekah A Childers (Childers, Rebekah)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Carrington Mortgage Services LLC by Melissa Elizabeth Manning (Manning, Melissa)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (rp, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion by David Harold DeCelles for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #4 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 4/10/2019 at 09:15 AM. (DeCelles, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Defendant U.S. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development for extension of time to file answer regarding notice of removal #1 (DeCelles, David)
March 26, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of David Harold DeCelles as U.S. Attorney for Defendant U.S. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development (DeCelles, David)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (DeCelles, David)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from DuPage, case number (2006CH01020) filed by U.S. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Filing)(DeCelles, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon, The v. Zielinski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Zielinski
Represented By: Matthew Eric Gurvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Zielinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Household Finance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene N Payne
Represented By: Timothy Michael McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: David Harold DeCelles
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services LLC
Represented By: Melissa Elizabeth Manning
Represented By: Timothy Michael McLean
Represented By: Rebekah A Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon, The
Represented By: David F Pustilnik
Represented By: Natalie Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?