The People of the State of Illinois et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: The People of the State of Illinois, The People of Union County and County of Union
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Wal-mart Stores East, LP, Individually and d/b/a Wal-mart Pharmacy Warehouses, H.D. Smith, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-mart stores, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., Johnson & Johnson, H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Specgx LLC, The Kroger Co., Noramco, Inc., CVS Indiana, LLC, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Walgreens Co., Individually and d/b/a Walgreens, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan PLC, Wal-mart Stores East, LP, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Walgreens Co., Walmart Inc. and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02169
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Electronic Acknowledgement of case transferred to the Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-45286, filed 04/18/2019. (ek, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 45 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District Ohio the electronic record. (nsf, )
April 18, 2019 Filing 44 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2804 Conditional Transfer Order filed 04/17/2019. (nsf, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Defendants' Unopposed Motion for extension of time to respond to Complaint #34 is granted. Status hearing set for 6/17/2019 at 9:00 AM. Motion hearing set for 4/8/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 42 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Specgx LLC (Berg, Nicholas)
April 5, 2019 Filing 41 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mallinckrodt LLC (Berg, Nicholas)
April 5, 2019 Filing 40 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC by Nicholas Martin Berg (Berg, Nicholas)
April 3, 2019 Filing 39 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Diamantatos, Tinos)
April 3, 2019 Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Megan Rose Braden (Braden, Megan)
April 3, 2019 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Tinos Diamantatos (Diamantatos, Tinos)
April 3, 2019 Filing 36 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., H.D. Smith, LLC (Gorenberg, Kenneth)
April 3, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Motion by Sky Anne Emison for presentment of extension of time #34 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 4/8/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Emison, Sky)
April 3, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for extension of time (Emison, Sky)
April 2, 2019 Filing 33 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Knutson, Sherry)
April 2, 2019 Filing 32 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Snapp, Erik)
April 2, 2019 Filing 31 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by CVS Indiana, LLC (Emison, Sky)
April 2, 2019 Filing 30 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by CVS Health Corporation (Emison, Sky)
April 2, 2019 Filing 29 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Emison, Sky)
April 2, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. by Sky Anne Emison (Emison, Sky)
April 2, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. by Sarah E. Harmon (Harmon, Sarah)
April 2, 2019 Filing 26 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Meyer, Julie)
April 2, 2019 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. by Emily Newhouse Dillingham (Dillingham, Emily)
April 2, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., H.D. Smith, LLC by Kenneth M. Gorenberg (Gorenberg, Kenneth)
April 2, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Allergan Finance, LLC by Timothy William Knapp (Knapp, Timothy)
April 2, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Allergan Finance, LLC by Martin L. Roth (Roth, Martin)
April 2, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Allergan Finance, LLC by Donna M. Welch (Welch, Donna)
April 2, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation by Margaret Marcia Schuchardt (Schuchardt, Margaret)
April 2, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation by Daniel I. Schlessinger (Schlessinger, Daniel)
April 2, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Corporation (Stanner, Daniel)
April 2, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. by Margaret Catherine O'Connor (O'Connor, Margaret)
April 2, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. by Erik William Snapp (Snapp, Erik)
April 2, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant McKesson Corporation by Kyle Alexander Cooper (Cooper, Kyle)
April 2, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant McKesson Corporation by Daniel L. Stanner (Stanner, Daniel)
April 2, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Sherry Ann Knutson of Tucker Ellis LLP (Knutson, Sherry)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. by Julie Fix Meyer (Meyer, Julie)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs County of Union, The People of Union County, The People of the State of Illinois by Gregory Jones (Jones, Gregory)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs County of Union, The People of Union County, The People of the State of Illinois by Ann Callis (Callis, Ann)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs County of Union, The People of Union County, The People of the State of Illinois by Thomas Lech (Lech, Thomas)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15656028. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(O'Croinin, Conor)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (rp, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record.(rp, )
March 28, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by CVS Health Corporation of Filing Notice of Filing Removal in State Court (Whitmer, Steven)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. by Steven Todd Whitmer (Whitmer, Steven)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. by Andrea Verney (Verney, Andrea)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Verney, Andrea)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2018-L-003909) filed by CVS Health Corporation Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15648026. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Emison, Sky)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The People of the State of Illinois et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People of the State of Illinois
Represented By: Ann Callis
Represented By: Thomas Lech
Represented By: Gregory Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People of Union County
Represented By: Ann Callis
Represented By: Thomas Lech
Represented By: Gregory Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Union
Represented By: Ann Callis
Represented By: Thomas Lech
Represented By: Gregory Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Kyle Alexander Cooper
Represented By: Daniel L. Stanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Erik William Snapp
Represented By: Margaret Catherine O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Martin Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Erik William Snapp
Represented By: Margaret Catherine O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Megan Rose Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-mart Stores East, LP, Individually and d/b/a Wal-mart Pharmacy Warehouses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth M. Gorenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Emily Newhouse Dillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Megan Rose Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Sarah E. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Erik William Snapp
Represented By: Margaret Catherine O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Megan Rose Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Megan Rose Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Steven Todd Whitmer
Represented By: Andrea Verney
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Represented By: Sky Anne Emison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-mart stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
Represented By: Emily Newhouse Dillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Sherry Ann Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Gorenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Daniel I. Schlessinger
Represented By: Margaret Marcia Schuchardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Sherry Ann Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Martin Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana, LLC
Represented By: Steven Todd Whitmer
Represented By: Andrea Verney
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Represented By: Sky Anne Emison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Co., Individually and d/b/a Walgreens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Todd Whitmer
Represented By: Andrea Verney
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Represented By: Sky Anne Emison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Sherry Ann Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Timothy William Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Megan Rose Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Sherry Ann Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?