Rilwala Properties Management, LLC et al v. Sheth
Plaintiff: Haresh Shah, Kilwala Properties Management LLC and Rilwala Properties Management, LLC
Defendant: Nishant K Sheth
Case Number: 1:2019cv02185
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Rilwala Properties Management, LLC, Haresh Shah Plaintiffs Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Terras, Alexander)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing and ruling on motion hearing held. Motion to dismiss #7 is withdrawn. Motion to Dismiss the amended complaint #14 is entered and briefed as follows: response by 7/11/19, reply by 7/18/19. Status hearing/ruling is set for 8/28/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 6/26/19 at 9:00 a.m. is re-set to 6/26/19 at 9:30 a.m. Defendant's motion to dismiss is entered and continued to 6/26/19 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rilwala Properties Management, LLC by Kayla Elizabeth Foley (Foley, Kayla)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Nishant K Sheth to dismiss Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Exhibits 1 and 2 to Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Erickson, Ann)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Haresh Shah, Rilwala Properties Management, LLC against Nishant K Sheth (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Terras, Alexander)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: In court hearing held. Amended complaint shall be filed by 6/7/19. Defendant's motion to dismiss is entered and continued to 6/26/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Nishant K Sheth re MOTION by Defendant Nishant K Sheth to dismiss complaint MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Nishant K Sheth #7 Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Motion to Dismiss)(Erickson, Ann)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Ann Marie Erickson for presentment of motion to dismiss, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #7 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/23/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Erickson, Ann)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Nishant K Sheth to dismiss complaint, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Nishant K Sheth (Erickson, Ann)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rilwala Properties Management, LLC by Alexander Terras (Terras, Alexander)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rilwala Properties Management, LLC by Aaron B. Chapin (Chapin, Aaron)
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (pk, )
March 29, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nishant K Sheth by Ann Marie Erickson (Erickson, Ann)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nishant K Sheth by Douglas Kent Morrison (Morrison, Douglas)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019-L-001654) filed by Nishant K Sheth Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15652418. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, Complaint, Exhibits to Complaint A and B, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint C and D, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morrison, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rilwala Properties Management, LLC et al v. Sheth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nishant K Sheth
Represented By: Ann Marie Erickson
Represented By: Douglas Kent Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haresh Shah
Represented By: Alexander Terras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kilwala Properties Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rilwala Properties Management, LLC
Represented By: Aaron B. Chapin
Represented By: Alexander Terras
Represented By: Kayla Elizabeth Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?