Gibson v. CHA et al
Plaintiff: Bonnie J. Gibson
Defendant: City of Chicago, HUD, CHA, Village Green and U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Case Number: 1:2019cv02227
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: After careful review of plaintiff's recent pro se emergency motion #13 , said motion is denied without prejudice until jurisdiction is established before this Court. Plaintiff is directed to contact her appointed attorney, Karen L. Beverly, (630) 369-2700 prior to filing any further pleadings with the Court. (rao, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 EMERGENCY MOTION by Plaintiff Bonnie J. Gibson. (jh, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS Report Of Appointed Counsel by Bonnie J. Gibson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Beverly, Karen)
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 EMERGENCY MOTION by Plaintiff Bonnie J. Gibson. (tt, )
April 3, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (tt, )
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: After a careful review of this recently filed pro se complaint, the Court easily concludes that it is insufficient to state a plausible timely federal cause of action against the named defendants. Therefore, said complaint is dismissed without prejudice. However, the Court will grant plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #4 and her motion for attorney representation #5 . Karen L. Beverly of Keough & Moody, P.C., 114 East Van Buren Ave., Naperville, IL 60540, (630) 369-2700, klb@kmlegal.com, is recruited to investigate whether or not any valid amended complaint can be filed for this dispute. Plaintiff's pro se emergency motion for a ruling on her IFP application is denied as moot. Plaintiff's pro se emergency motion to be heard within five days is denied until plaintiff's appointed counsel can investigate this matter. Signed by the Honorable Ruben Castillo on 4/3/2019. Mailed notice (tt, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 EMERGENCY MOTION by Plaintiff Bonnie J. Gibson (tt, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Bonnie J. Gibson for attorney representation. (tt, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Bonnie J. Gibson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (tt, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Bonnie J. Gibson (tt, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (tt, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and six copies by Bonnie J. Gibson. (tt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. CHA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie J. Gibson
Represented By: Karen L Beverly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?