Wolff v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Steven F. Wolff
Defendant: United States of America
Counter Defendant: Dmitry Y Isaev
Case Number: 1:2019cv02242
Filed: April 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:6532
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to counterclaim by Steven F. Wolff(Decatorsmith, Jonathan)
June 5, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Counter Defendant Dmitry Y Isaev (pj, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM filed by United States of America against Steven F. Wolff, Dmitry Y Isaev . by United States of America(Strandjord, James)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Kristen Elise Rau as U.S. Attorney for Defendant United States of America (Rau, Kristen)
April 3, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (acm)
April 2, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven F. Wolff by Jonathan Decatorsmith (Decatorsmith, Jonathan)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Decatorsmith, Jonathan)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Steven F. Wolff; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Claims for Refund, #2 Exhibit Denial Letter)(Decatorsmith, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolff v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven F. Wolff
Represented By: Jonathan Decatorsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Kristen Elise Rau
Represented By: James Mark Strandjord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Dmitry Y Isaev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?