Bates v. Envision Unlimited

Plaintiff: Marshall Bates
Defendant: Envision Unlimited
Case Number: 1:2019cv02295
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #9 is granted. Thecomplaint is dismissed without prejudice. If plaintiff wants to pursue this case, he must submit an amended complaint by July 26, 2019. Failure to file an amended complaint will lead to a dismissal with prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/28/2019. Mailed notice (smm, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Marshall Bates for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (tt, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice because it is incomplete. Plaintiff must answer question 2.B. and disclose his last employer, his salary or wages, and the period of employment. Plaintiff should also explain how he is supporting himself. He has answered "no" to all questions so it is unclear how he is able to survive and get basic necessities like food and shelter. The clerk shall send a blank IFP application to plaintiff. If plaintiff wants to proceed with this case, he must either pay the $400 filing fee or submit a renewed, complete IFP application by May 6, 2019. Failure to comply with this order will lead to this case being summarily dismissed. Notices mailed. (Attachments: #1 IFP application) (psm, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Marshall Bates (pk, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Marshall Bates for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (pk, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (pk, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and by Marshall Bates. (Exhibit) (pk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. Envision Unlimited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envision Unlimited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?