Saggu v. Brennan

Plaintiff: Gurmeet S, Saggu and Gurmeet S. Saggu
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan Postmaster General of the United States Postal Service and Megan J. Brennan
Case Number: 1:2019cv02303
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to amended complaint by Megan J. Brennan(Hancock, Virginia)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 6/18/2019. Plaintiff to provide settlement demand to Defendant by close of business 6/19/2019. Status hearing set for 8/14/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 AGREED PRIVACY ACT ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/17/2019. Mailed notice. (etv, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Agreed motion for entry of privacy act order #9 is granted. Mailed notice. (etv, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Virginia Ovitz Hancock for presentment of motion for order #9 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Hancock, Virginia)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Megan J. Brennan for order Agreed Motion for Entry of Privacy Act Order (Hancock, Virginia)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Gurmeet S. Saggu (Smith, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO FRCP 15(a)(2) AMENDED complaint by Gurmeet S. Saggu against Megan J. Brennan (Smith, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: By agreement, initial status hearing set for 6/17/2019 is stricken and re-set to 6/18/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Virginia Ovitz Hancock as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Megan J. Brennan (Hancock, Virginia)
April 10, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Megan J. Brennan, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (mc, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 6/17/2019 at 09:00 AM, courtroom 2141. Mailed notice. (etv, )
April 5, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gurmeet S, Saggu by Michael T. Smith (Smith, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Michael)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Gurmeet S, Saggu; Y. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15679300. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saggu v. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gurmeet S, Saggu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gurmeet S. Saggu
Represented By: Michael T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan Postmaster General of the United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Virginia Ovitz Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?