The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company v. Nelson et al
Plaintiff: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: Nancy Nelson and Richard Nelson
Case Number: 1:2019cv02336
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Referring Judge: Sara L Ellis
2 Judge: Iain D Johnston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Agreed motion to reset initial status hearing and extend time for filing of Defendants' responsive pleading #10 is granted. Defendants' responsive pleading is due by 7/16/2019. Status hearing set for 6/14/2019 is stricken and reset to 8/2/2019 at 9:30 AM with joint initial status report due by 7/26/2019. No appearance required on 6/14/2019. Mailed notice (rj, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company regarding Summons and Complaint for Declaratory Judgment served on Nancy Nelson on 5-29-19 (Valentino, Richard)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company regarding Summons and Complaint for Declaratory Judgment served on Richard Nelson on 5-29-19 (Valentino, Richard)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Richard Thomas Valentino for presentment of extension of time #10 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 6/14/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Valentino, Richard)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company for extension of time and reset initial status hearing (Valentino, Richard)
April 22, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Nancy Nelson, Richard Nelson (yt)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 6/14/2019 at 9:30AM and will be held at the United States Courthouse in Rockford, IL. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 6/7/2019. Emailed notice (rj, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 INTRA district transfer from the Eastern Division. Case assigned to Judge Honorable Sara L. Ellis and Honorable Iain D. Johnston for all further proceedings. (jp, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSFERRED the case record to the Western Division. (sxb, )
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: It appearing that this case was filed in error in the Eastern Division and that this case should have been filed in the Western Division, the court hereby transfers this case to the United States District Court, Northern District of Illinois, Western Division. Signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 4/10/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 06/06/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases.Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
April 5, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company by Richard Thomas Valentino (Valentino, Richard)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Valentino, Richard)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15682605. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Travelers Policy 150 101, #2 Exhibit 2 Travelers Policy 754 101)(Valentino, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company v. Nelson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard Thomas Valentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?