Porter v. Crothall Laundry Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Victor Porter
Defendant: Crothall Laundry Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02351
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Crothall Laundry Services, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Victor Porter to amend/correctMOTION by Plaintiff Victor Porter to vacate #15 (Taylor, Jill)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 RECEIVED Amended Complaint and by Victor Porter. (Attachments). (gcy, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Victor Porter for presentment of Plaintiff's motion to amend complaint and vacate briefing schedule or motion to dismiss #15 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/11/2019 at 08:45 AM. (gcy, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff Victor Porter to file amended complaint and Vacate briefing Schedule or motion to dismiss. (gcy, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 WITHDRAWING Kara Goodwin as counsel for Defendant Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. and substituting Frederick T. Smith as counsel of record (Smith, Frederick)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. by Frederick T. Smith (Smith, Frederick)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 5/7/2019. Plaintiff did not receive a copy of the defendant's motion to dismiss. Counsel for defendant to send plaintiff a new copy of the motion by 5/10/2019. Plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to dismiss #8 to be filed by 7/1/2019. Defendant's reply to be filed by 7/15/2019. Oral arguments are set for 7/30/2019 at 10:30 AM. Status hearing set for 6/10/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 4/23/2019. Plaintiff did not appear. Defendant has had no contact with plaintiff. Defendant's motion to dismiss #8 is entered and continued to 5/7/2019 at 8:45 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. (Taylor, Jill)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Jill C. Taylor for presentment of motion to dismiss,,, #8 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 4/23/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Taylor, Jill)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. to dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Charge EEOC Charge 440-2015-02284, #2 Exhibit B - Dismissal EEOC Charge 440-2015-02284, #3 Exhibit C - Second Charge IDHR Charge 2017CF0174, #4 Exhibit D - Dismissal IDHR Charge 2017CF0174, #5 Exhibit E - Request for Review IDHR Charge 2017CF0174 (03-08-2018), #6 Exhibit F - Third Charge IDHR Charge 2017CF0743, #7 Exhibit G - Dismissal IDHR Charge 2017CF0743, #8 Exhibit H - Dismissal IDHR Charge 2017CF0743 (09-28-2018), #9 Exhibit I - Second Request for Review IDHR Charge 2017CF0743 (11-19-2018), #10 Exhibit J- Fourth Charge IDHR Charge 2017CF1694, #11 Exhibit K - Dismissal IDHR Charge 2017CF1694 (01-12-2018), #12 Exhibit L - Dismissal IDHR Charge 2017CF1694, #13 Exhibit M - Plaintiff's Complaint, #14 Exhibit N - Unreported Cases)(Taylor, Jill)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman and is set for a status hearing on 6/10/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are reminded to review the timelines set out in this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to plaintiff. (nsf, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. by Kara Lea Goodwin (Goodwin, Kara)
April 8, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
April 8, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. by Jill C. Taylor (Taylor, Jill)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Taylor, Jill)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019L002048) filed by Crothall Laundry Services, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15684455. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Bhavin Patel Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Cook County Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Taylor, Jill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Crothall Laundry Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crothall Laundry Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jill C. Taylor
Represented By: Kara Lea Goodwin
Represented By: Frederick T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?