Perform Investment Limited d/b/a DAZN v. Perez et al

Plaintiff: Perform Investment Limited d/b/a DAZN
Defendant: Wendy Espinoza, 5800 Corporation and Clarence Perez
Case Number: 1:2019cv02377
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion for continuance #11 is granted without an appearance. Status hearing set for 7/2/2019 is stricken and re-set to 8/15/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Perform Investment Limited d/b/a DAZN to continue July 2, 2019 Status Hearing (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lonstein, Julie)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 6/17/2019. Status hearing set for 7/2/2019 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice. (etv, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED other #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Lonstein, Julie)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Perform Investment Limited d/b/a DAZN as to 5800 Corporation on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Lonstein, Julie)
April 16, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants 5800 Corporation, Wendy Espinoza, Clarence Perez (mc, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Perform Investment Limited d/b/a DAZN by Sheldon S. Gomberg (Gomberg, Sheldon)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 6/17/2019 at 09:00 AM, courtroom 2141. Mailed notice. (etv, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (yap, )
April 9, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Perform Investment Limited d/b/a DAZN re complaint, #1 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding Copyright (Lonstein, Julie)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Perform Investment Limited d/b/a DAZN by Julie Cohen Lonstein (Lonstein, Julie)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Perform Investment Limited d/b/a DAZN (Lonstein, Julie)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Perform Investment Limited d/b/a DAZN; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15689895. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Exhibit A to Complaint - Advertisement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Summons as to Deft., Clarence Perez, #4 Supplement Summons as to Deft., Wendy Espinoza, #5 Supplement Summons as to Deft., 5800 Corporation)(Lonstein, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perform Investment Limited d/b/a DAZN v. Perez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Espinoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5800 Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perform Investment Limited d/b/a DAZN
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Represented By: Sheldon S. Gomberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?