ClearOne, Inc. v. Shure Incorporated
Plaintiff: ClearOne, Inc.
Defendant: Shure Inc and Shure Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv02421
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 29 Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant ClearOne, Inc.'s ANSWER to counterclaim filed by Defendant and Counter-Plaintiff Shure Incorporated (ECF 24) by ClearOne, Inc.(Dixon, Douglas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Unopposed motion to seal portions of answer #25 is granted. A redacted version of the answer is to be filed in the public record. The required chambers copy must be a complete and intact copy of the version filed under seal. In addition, the case is set for a status hearing on July 17, 2019 at 9:30 AM. (mk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 27 SEALED DOCUMENT by Counter Claimant Shure Incorporated, Defendant Shure Incorporated Answer to Complaint (Rademaker, Bradley)
June 18, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Bradley F. Rademaker for presentment of motion to seal #25 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 6/25/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Rademaker, Bradley)
June 18, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION by Counter Claimant Shure Incorporated, Defendant Shure Incorporated to seal Portions of Its Answer (Rademaker, Bradley)
June 18, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Shure Incorporated against ClearOne, Inc. . by Shure Incorporated(Rademaker, Bradley)
June 18, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shure Incorporated by Kevin Charles May (May, Kevin)
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shure Incorporated by Michael R. Turner (Turner, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shure Incorporated by Bradley F. Rademaker (Rademaker, Bradley)
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held with attorneys for both sides. Defendant's response to the complaint appears to be due on 6/18/2019. Motion for relatedness will be filed in Case No. 17 C 3078 after that. The Court sets the following dates for disclosures and filings under this District's Local Patent Rules (LPR) as follows: LPR 2.1 - 7/2/2019; LPR 2.2 - 7/16/2019; LPR 2.3 - 7/30/2019; LPR 2.5 - 8/13/2019; LPR 3/1(a)(1) - 11/26/2019; LPR 3.1(a)(2) & 3.1(b) - 12/10/2019; LPR 3.2 - 1/7/2020; LPR 4.1(a) - 1/21/2020; LPR 4.1(b) - 1/28/2020. Claim construction briefs are due by 3/24/2020 for defendant; 4/7/2020 for plaintiff; and 4/14/2020 for defendant's reply. Claim construction hearing is set for 5/8/2020 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motions of Christina Von der Ahe Rayburn and Michael Acquah to appear pro hac vice are granted. (mk)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 ClearOne's Report in Response to the Court's May 24, 2019 Minute Entry (ECF 17) by ClearOne, Inc. (Dixon, Douglas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 6/10/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. A completed copy of Appendix A to the Local Patent Rules, including a listing of actual dates corresponding to the due dates contained in the Local Patent Rules, is to be filed by 6/7/2019. (mk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by ClearOne, Inc.. Shure Incorporated waiver sent on 4/19/2019, answer due 6/18/2019. (MISHRA, SOURABH)
April 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15736122. (Acquah, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff ClearOne, Inc. Complaint for Patent Infringement and Trade Secret Misappropriation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-O)(Leach, Garret)
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15732659. (Von der Ahe, Christina)
April 17, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motions of John C. Hueston, Douglas J. Dixon, and Sourabh Mishra to appear pro hac vice are granted. Plaintiff's motion to seal portions of its complaint and exhibits is also granted. It appears that plaintiff has already filed a redacted version of its complaint. Plaintiff is directed to immediately file a complete, unredacted version of the complaint under seal. (mk)
April 15, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Shure Incorporated (pj, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15713517. (MISHRA, SOURABH)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15713311. (Dixon, Douglas)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15713190. (Hueston, John)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 Exhibits - Patent Information)(smm, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Garret A. Leach for presentment of motion to seal document #6 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/18/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Leach, Garret)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff ClearOne, Inc. to seal document (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas Dixon)(Leach, Garret)
April 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Claim Involving Patents Under Local Rule 3.4 by ClearOne, Inc. (Leach, Garret)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by ClearOne, Inc. (Leach, Garret)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ClearOne, Inc. by Garret A. Leach (Leach, Garret)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Leach, Garret)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by ClearOne, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15699074. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-O)(Leach, Garret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ClearOne, Inc. v. Shure Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ClearOne, Inc.
Represented By: Garret A. Leach
Represented By: SOURABH MISHRA
Represented By: Michael Acquah
Represented By: John C Hueston
Represented By: Douglas J. Dixon
Represented By: Christina Marie Von der Ahe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shure Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shure Incorporated
Represented By: Bradley F. Rademaker
Represented By: Kevin Charles May
Represented By: Michael R. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?