Coyote Logistics, LLC v. Rising Son Transport LLC
Plaintiff: Coyote Logistics, LLC
Defendant: Rising Son Transport LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02468
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/27/2019. Mailed notice(gel, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 6/27/2019. Defendant failed to appear and failed to notify Chambers of any scheduling conflicts. Plaintiff's motion for default judgment #12 is granted. Enter default judgment order. All pending deadlines and hearings are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gel, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Motion by Joel H. Steiner for presentment of motion for default judgment #12 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/27/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Steiner, Joel)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Coyote Logistics, LLC for default judgment as to Defendant Rising Son Transport LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit aff Chris Jordan, #2 Exhibit Aff Ex 1-4)(Steiner, Joel)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 5/23/2019. Oral motion for entry of default as to Defendant is granted. Any motion for default judgment shall be filed on or before 6/20/2019 and set for presentment on 6/27/2019 at 9:45 a.m in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS Report Plainitff's Initial Status Report by Coyote Logistics, LLC (Steiner, Joel)
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coyote Logistics, LLC (Steiner, Joel)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Coyote Logistics, LLC as to Rising Son Transport LLC on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Steiner, Joel)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP Standing Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 5/23/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 5/13/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
April 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Rising Son Transport LLC (mc, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
April 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Steiner, Joel)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Coyote Logistics, LLC by Paul Anthony Gajewski (Gajewski, Paul)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Coyote Logistics, LLC by Joel H. Steiner (Steiner, Joel)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Steiner, Joel)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Coyote Logistics, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15706723.(Steiner, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coyote Logistics, LLC v. Rising Son Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coyote Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Paul Anthony Gajewski
Represented By: Joel H. Steiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rising Son Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?