Taylor v. Bank of America Merchant Services
Plaintiff: Tanya Taylor
Defendant: Bank of America Merchant Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv02496
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Referring Judge: Sunil R Harjani
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to dismiss #20 to be filed by 7/30/2019. Defendant's reply to be filed by 8/13/2019. Once the matter is fully briefed, the court shall take it under advisement. No appearance necessary on 7/9/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Defendant's request to extend the deadline to inform the Court if they are willing to participate in a preliminary settlement conference to 7/12/19 is granted without objection from plaintiff. By 7/12/2019, counsel shall jointly contact Judge Harjani's Courtroom Deputy to advise if a preliminary telephone settlement discussion is desired and if the parties want the Court's assistance in settling this case. (rbf, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Initial status hearing held and continued to 8/29/2019 at 9:15 a.m. Counsel reported on the status of the case. For the reasons stated in open court, Defendant's oral request to stay all discovery pending a ruling on its motion to dismiss and the parties' settlement discussions is granted. Both counsel advised that they wished to conserve resources while they discussed settlement and also await a ruling on a motion to dismiss. By 7/3/2019, counsel shall jointly contact Judge Harjani's Courtroom Deputy to advise if a preliminary telephone settlement discussion is desired and if the parties want the Court's assistance in settling this case.Mailed notice (lxs, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Sean C. Herring for presentment of motion to dismiss #20 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/9/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Herring, Sean)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM by Bank of America Merchant Services in support of motion to dismiss #20 DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF ITS 12(b) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (Herring, Sean)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant Bank of America Merchant Services to dismiss DEFENDANT'S 12(b) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (Herring, Sean)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 STATUS Report (JOINT INITIAL) by Tanya Taylor (Peeters, Lorraine)
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Initial status hearing set for 6/26/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in courtroom 1858. Out-of-state counsel may make arrangements with Judge Harjani's Courtroom Deputy at lynette_santiago@ilnd.uscourts.gov to participate in the status hearing by telephone. Local counsel must be present personally. Counsel shall file and deliver a copy of an initial status report to Room 1808 at least three (3) business days before the initial status hearing. Counsel are expected to be familiar with and follow Judge Harjani's Case Management Procedures posted on his web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (lxs, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The Court grants defendant's unopposed motion to extend the time to respond to the complaint #15 . Defendant to respond to the complaint by 6/24/2019. No appearance is necessary on 6/20/2019. Mailed notice (cn).
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 DEFENDANT'S NOTICE of Motion by Sean C. Herring for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, #15 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/20/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Herring, Sean)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Bank of America Merchant Services for extension of time to file response/reply DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (Herring, Sean)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Sunil R. Harjani for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery supervision and settlement conference. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 6/13/2019. Fact discovery to be completed by 10/17/2019. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Harjani for discovery supervision and settlement. Status hearing is set for 10/11/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tanya Taylor by Madeline K. Engel (Engel, Madeline)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS Report JOINT by Tanya Taylor (Peeters, Lorraine)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bank of America Merchant Services by Brenna R. Mclean Attorney Appearance for Defendant Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC (Mclean, Brenna)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bank of America Merchant Services by Sean C. Herring Attorney Appearance for Defendant, Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC (Herring, Sean)
April 26, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Tanya Taylor. Bank of America Merchant Services waiver sent on 4/16/2019, answer due 6/17/2019. (Caffarelli, Alejandro)
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman and is set for a status hearing on 6/13/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are reminded to review the timelines set out in this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tanya Taylor by Lorraine Teraldico Peeters (Peeters, Lorraine)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
April 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tanya Taylor by Alejandro Caffarelli (Caffarelli, Alejandro)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Tanya Taylor by Alexis D Martin (Martin, Alexis)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Martin, Alexis)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tanya Taylor; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15711445.(Martin, Alexis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Bank of America Merchant Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Merchant Services
Represented By: Brenna R. Mclean
Represented By: Sean C. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Taylor
Represented By: Alejandro Caffarelli
Represented By: Alexis D Martin
Represented By: Madeline K. Engel
Represented By: Lorraine Teraldico Peeters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?