Szplett v. Kenco Logistic Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Leonard A Szplett
Defendant: Jay Elliott, Trace Spier, Kelvin Walsh, Tammi Fowler, Todd Moore, Mario Lopez, Robert Coffey, Michael Manzello, David Crawley, David Jabaley, The Hartford, Mars, Inc., Paula Hise, Kenco Logistic Services, LLC and David Caines
Case Number: 1:2019cv02500
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 35 STATUS Report Initial Status Report by David Caines, David Crawley, Jay Elliott, Tammi Fowler, Paula Hise, David Jabaley, Kenco Logistic Services, LLC, Michael Manzello, Trace Spier, Kelvin Walsh (Moran, Jody)
July 10, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Motion by Kimberly J Overbaugh for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #32 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/18/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Overbaugh, Kimberly)
July 8, 2019 Filing 33 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Robert Coffey, Mars, Inc., Todd Moore (Overbaugh, Kimberly)
July 8, 2019 Filing 32 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Robert Coffey, Mars, Inc., Todd Moore (Overbaugh, Kimberly)
July 8, 2019 Filing 31 Notice of Presentment by Robert Coffey, Mars, Inc., Todd Moore (Overbaugh, Kimberly)
July 8, 2019 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mars, Inc. (Overbaugh, Kimberly)
July 8, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph R. Jeffery for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #27 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/16/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Jeffery, Joseph)
July 8, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM by The Hartford in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #27 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-April 8, 2015 letter, #2 Exhibit B-POI, #3 Exhibit C-Policy and Rider)(Jeffery, Joseph)
July 8, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant The Hartford (Jeffery, Joseph)
July 8, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by Jody Wilner Moran for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #23 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 7/16/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Moran, Jody)
July 8, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by David Caines, David Crawley, Jay Elliott, Tammi Fowler, Paula Hise, David Jabaley, Kenco Logistic Services, LLC, Michael Manzello, Trace Spier, Kelvin Walsh in support of motion for miscellaneous relief, #23 Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moran, Jody)
July 8, 2019 Filing 24 Defendant's Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by David Caines, David Crawley, Jay Elliott, Tammi Fowler, Paula Hise, David Jabaley, Kenco Logistic Services, LLC, Michael Manzello, Trace Spier, Kelvin Walsh (Moran, Jody)
July 8, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendants David Caines, David Crawley, Jay Elliott, Tammi Fowler, Paula Hise, David Jabaley, Kenco Logistic Services, LLC, Michael Manzello, Trace Spier, Kelvin WalshDefendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 12(b)(6) (Moran, Jody)
June 20, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint #21 is granted. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint as a separate docket entry. This is Plaintiff's one amendment of right under Civil Rule 15(a)(1). Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION by Plaintiff Leonard A Szplett to amend complaint (Exhibits). (aee, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motions for extension of time to answer #14 , #16 and #18 are granted. The time for Defendants to respond to the complaint is extended to 7/8/2019. Motion hearings set for 6/19/2019 #15 , #17 and #19 are stricken. The status hearing set for 7/9/2019 #7 is stricken and re-set for 7/16/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Joseph R. Jeffery for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #18 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/19/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Jeffery, Joseph)
June 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant The Hartford for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Jeffery, Joseph)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas R. Davies for presentment of (Davies, Thomas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants Robert Coffey, Mars, Inc., Todd Moore for extension of time to file answer (Davies, Thomas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Unopposed Motion NOTICE of Motion by Jody Wilner Moran for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, #14 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 6/19/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Moran, Jody)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants David Caines, David Crawley, Jay Elliott, Tammi Fowler, Paula Hise, David Jabaley, Kenco Logistic Services, LLC, Michael Manzello, Trace Spier, Kelvin Walsh for extension of time to file answer Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Moran, Jody)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants David Caines, David Crawley, Jay Elliott, Tammi Fowler, Paula Hise, David Jabaley, Kenco Logistic Services, LLC, Michael Manzello, Trace Spier, Kelvin Walsh by Julia Pearce Argentieri (Argentieri, Julia) Docket text modified by Clerk's Office on 6/14/2019 (mma, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants David Caines, David Crawley, Jay Elliott, Tammi Fowler, Paula Hise, David Jabaley, Kenco Logistic Services, LLC, Michael Manzello, Trace Spier, Kelvin Walsh by Jody Wilner Moran (Moran, Jody) Docket text modified by Clerk's Office on 6/14/2019 (mma, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Robert Coffey, Mars, Inc., Todd Moore by Kimberly J Overbaugh (Overbaugh, Kimberly)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Robert Coffey, Mars, Inc., Todd Moore by Thomas R. Davies (Davies, Thomas)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Hartford by Joseph R. Jeffery (Jeffery, Joseph)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Hartford by Donald Alan Murday (Murday, Donald)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: The docket does not indicate that summonses have been served.The status hearing set for 5/30/2019 #6 is stricken and re-set for 7/9/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff is reminded of the requirements of Civil Rule 4(m).Mailed notice. (jlj, )
May 6, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants David Caines, Robert Coffey, Jay Elliott, Tammi Fowler, Paula Hise, David Jabaley, Kenco Logistic Services, LLC, Mario Lopez, Michael Manzello, Mars, Inc., Todd Moore, Trace Spier, The Hartford, Kelvin Walsh (daj, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 5/30/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Leonard A Szplett. (aee, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (aee, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Leonard A Szplett; Jury Demand (Exhibits). (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(aee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Szplett v. Kenco Logistic Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Elliott
Represented By: Jody Wilner Moran
Represented By: Julia Pearce Argentieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trace Spier
Represented By: Jody Wilner Moran
Represented By: Julia Pearce Argentieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelvin Walsh
Represented By: Jody Wilner Moran
Represented By: Julia Pearce Argentieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammi Fowler
Represented By: Jody Wilner Moran
Represented By: Julia Pearce Argentieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Moore
Represented By: Thomas R. Davies
Represented By: Kimberly J Overbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Coffey
Represented By: Thomas R. Davies
Represented By: Kimberly J Overbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Manzello
Represented By: Jody Wilner Moran
Represented By: Julia Pearce Argentieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Crawley
Represented By: Jody Wilner Moran
Represented By: Julia Pearce Argentieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Jabaley
Represented By: Jody Wilner Moran
Represented By: Julia Pearce Argentieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford
Represented By: Donald Alan Murday
Represented By: Joseph R. Jeffery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mars, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R. Davies
Represented By: Kimberly J Overbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Hise
Represented By: Jody Wilner Moran
Represented By: Julia Pearce Argentieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenco Logistic Services, LLC
Represented By: Jody Wilner Moran
Represented By: Julia Pearce Argentieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Caines
Represented By: Jody Wilner Moran
Represented By: Julia Pearce Argentieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard A Szplett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?