MacNeil Automotive Products Limited v. Yita, LLC et al

Plaintiff: MacNeil Automotive Products Limited d/b/a WeatherTech and MacNeil Automotive Products Limited
Defendant: LED Kingdomus and Yita, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02514
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Yita, LLC (ec, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 6/13/2019. Plaintiff's oral motion for an extension of time to serve defendant is granted. Service on defendant to be completed by 8/12/2019. Status hearing is set for 8/12/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS Report MACNEIL'S NEW CASE STATUS REPORT by MacNeil Automotive Products Limited (Grabemann, Robert)
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman and is set for a status hearing on 6/13/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are reminded to review the timelines set out in this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 EMAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (nsf, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 EMAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (nsf, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
April 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by MacNeil Automotive Products Limited d/b/a WeatherTech (Grabemann, Robert)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 3.4 Notice of Patents and Trademarks in Suit by MacNeil Automotive Products Limited d/b/a WeatherTech (Grabemann, Robert)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MacNeil Automotive Products Limited d/b/a WeatherTech by Timothy M Schaum (Schaum, Timothy)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff MacNeil Automotive Products Limited d/b/a WeatherTech by Robert S. Grabemann (Grabemann, Robert)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Grabemann, Robert)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by MacNeil Automotive Products Limited d/b/a WeatherTech; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15713999. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 2-3)(Grabemann, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacNeil Automotive Products Limited v. Yita, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LED Kingdomus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yita, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MacNeil Automotive Products Limited d/b/a WeatherTech
Represented By: Robert S. Grabemann
Represented By: Timothy M Schaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MacNeil Automotive Products Limited
Represented By: Timothy M Schaum
Represented By: Robert S. Grabemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?