Lifers, Inc. v. Daniels
Plaintiff: Lifers, Inc.
Defendant: Joseph W Daniels
Case Number: 1:2019cv02515
Filed: April 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 6/27/2019. For the reasons stated on the record, motion hearing continued to 8/13/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
May 28, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 5/28/2019. Defendant's motion to dismiss #8 is stricken and defendant's amended motion to dismiss #12 is entered and continued to 6/27/2019 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
May 8, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE Mediation Program (Malnar, Eric)
May 3, 2019 Filing 14 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Ronald Lee Bell for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, #12 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/28/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Bell, Ronald)
May 3, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Joseph W Daniels in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, #12 (Bell, Ronald)
May 3, 2019 Filing 12 Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Joseph W Daniels (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Amended Affidavit, #2 Appendix Amended Index, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit Amended Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit Amended Exhibit M)(Bell, Ronald)
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Ronald Lee Bell for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #8 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 5/28/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Bell, Ronald)
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Joseph W Daniels by Ronald Lee Bell (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing NOF Appearance)(Bell, Ronald)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Dismiss by Joseph W Daniels (Bell, Ronald)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Joseph W Daniels (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Joseph Daniels Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit Exhibit L)(Bell, Ronald)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (ph, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 List of trademarks). (ph, )
April 15, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Joseph W Daniels (pj, )
April 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
April 13, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 3.4 by Lifers, Inc. (Malnar, Eric)
April 13, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Malnar, Eric)
April 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Lifers, Inc. re complaint #1 (Malnar, Eric)
April 13, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lifers, Inc. by Eric J. Malnar (Malnar, Eric)
April 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Lifers, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15714287. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Malnar, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lifers, Inc. v. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lifers, Inc.
Represented By: Eric J. Malnar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph W Daniels
Represented By: Ronald Lee Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?