Sawbill Strategies Inc. v. National Association of Realtors et al
Plaintiff: Sawbill Strategies Inc.
Defendant: Re/Max Holdings, Inc., Realogy Holdings Corp., National Association of Realtors, Keller Williams Realty, Inc. and HomeServices of America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02544
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Referring Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE by Timothy Ray of Change of Address (Ray, Timothy)
June 26, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by Martin G. Durkin of Change of Address (Durkin, Martin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiffs have filed a Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint in the related case 1:19-cv-01610 and orally moved to administratively close this action. Plaintiffs' oral motion is granted. Any future filings that relate to this case are to be filed 1:19-cv-01610. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cn).
June 24, 2019 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: For the record, the status hearing of 06/25/2019 with Judge Chang is vacated in light of the reassignment. Modified on 6/24/2019 (slb, ). (Main Document 31 replaced on 6/24/2019) (slb, ).
June 10, 2019 Filing 30 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Edmond E. Chang no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/10/2019.(ek, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Application by Stacey Anne Mahoney to appear pro hac vice #28 on behalf of Defendant Realogy Holdings Corporation is granted. Emailed notice (slb, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15859381. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Mahoney, Stacey Anne)
May 23, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Realogy Holdings Corp. by Kenneth Michael Kliebard (Kliebard, Kenneth)
May 21, 2019 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc. by Timothy Ray (Ray, Timothy)
May 21, 2019 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Re/Max Holdings, Inc. by Odeshoo Hasdoo (Hasdoo, Odeshoo)
May 21, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Re/Max Holdings, Inc. by Erin Lind Shencopp (Shencopp, Erin)
May 21, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Re/Max Holdings, Inc. by Paula W. Render (Render, Paula)
May 21, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc. by William Foster Farley (Farley, William)
May 21, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Keller Williams Realty, Inc. by Martin G. Durkin (Durkin, Martin)
May 21, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The parties' extension motion #17 to answer or respond to the complaint is granted in part. The deadline is extended to 06/21/2019. But if the motion to reassign this case as related to 19 C 1610 is denied, then it is not apparent why the answer should await a decision on the dismissal motions in that case. To be sure, it appears that there is no objection to the reassignment motion and it might very well be granted, but if it is denied, then this case will move forward independently. The status hearing of 06/07/2019 is reset to 06/25/2019 at 8:45 a.m., with the joint initial status report due by 06/21/2019. If the reassignment motion has not been decided as 06/21/2019 approaches, then the parties may file another extension motion. Emailed notice (slb, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs and NOTICE OF FILING OF PROOFS OF SERVICE FOR SUMMONS AND PLEADINGS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Affidavit re: Defendant NAR, #2 Exhibit Affidavit re: Defendant HomeServices, #3 Exhibit Affidavit re: Defendant Keller Williams, #4 Exhibit Affidavit re: Defendant RE/MAX, #5 Exhibit Affidavit re: Defendant Realogy, #6 Certificate of Service)(Doyle, Thomas)
May 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Arthur Doyle for presentment of extension of time #17 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 5/23/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Doyle, Thomas)
May 20, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Plaintiff Sawbill Strategies Inc. for extension of time and Agreed Motion for Entry of an Agreed Order Extending the Deadline for the Defendants to Respond to the Sawbill Complaint (Doyle, Thomas)
May 13, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Sawbill Strategies Inc. regarding Summons and Class Action Complaint served on National Association of Realtors on May 2, 2019 (Doyle, Thomas)
May 10, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Applications #12 #13 #14 by Matthew B. Barr, Matthew Thomas Ciulla and Robert Dean Macgill to appear pro hac vice are granted. Emailed notice (slb, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15801450. (Barr, Matthew)
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15801427. (Macgill, Robert)
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15801376. (Ciulla, Matthew)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant HomeServices of America, Inc. by Karoline Elizabeth Jackson (Jackson, Karoline)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant HomeServices of America, Inc. by Denise A. Lazar (Lazar, Denise)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Association of Realtors by Adam J. Diederich (Diederich, Adam)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Association of Realtors by Jack R. Bierig (Bierig, Jack)
April 30, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants HomeServices of America, Inc., Keller Williams Realty, Inc., National Association of Realtors, Re/Max Holdings, Inc., Realogy Holdings Corp. (mc, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing set for 06/07/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases.Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sawbill Strategies Inc. by Kenneth A. Wexler (Wexler, Kenneth)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sawbill Strategies Inc. by Mark Richard Miller (Miller, Mark)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
April 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sawbill Strategies Inc. by Thomas Arthur Doyle (Doyle, Thomas)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Doyle, Thomas)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action Complaint) filed by Sawbill Strategies Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15718891.(Doyle, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sawbill Strategies Inc. v. National Association of Realtors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Re/Max Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Erin Lind Shencopp
Represented By: Odeshoo Hasdoo
Represented By: Paula W. Render
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realogy Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Kliebard
Represented By: Stacey Anne Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association of Realtors
Represented By: Adam J. Diederich
Represented By: Jack R. Bierig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keller Williams Realty, Inc.
Represented By: Martin G. Durkin
Represented By: William Foster Farley
Represented By: Timothy Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeServices of America, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Dean Macgill
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Ciulla
Represented By: Matthew B. Barr
Represented By: Denise A. Lazar
Represented By: Karoline Elizabeth Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sawbill Strategies Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Arthur Doyle
Represented By: Mark Richard Miller
Represented By: Kenneth A. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?