Ferguson v. Wilkie

Plaintiff: Joseph Ferguson
Defendant: Secretary Robert Wilkie and U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 1:2019cv02554
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joseph Ferguson by Robin B. Potter (Potter, Robin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joseph Ferguson by Patrick James Cowlin (Cowlin, Patrick)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Ferguson as to Robert Wilkie served on 4/30/2019, answer due 7/1/2019 (Randolph, Justin)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 7/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) planning report re MIDP due 7/23/2019. The report must comply with the requirements of the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (yap, )
April 16, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Robert Wilkie, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (mc, )
April 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joseph Ferguson by Justin Giles Randolph (Randolph, Justin)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Randolph, Justin)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joseph Ferguson; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15720489.(Randolph, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Robert Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Ferguson
Represented By: Robin B. Potter
Represented By: Patrick James Cowlin
Represented By: Justin Giles Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?