Price v. McCoy et al

Plaintiff: Christopher R Price
Defendant: Braeseke, Mendoza, McCoy and Unknown officer first shift
Case Number: 1:2019cv02560
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Braeseke, McCoy, Mendoza by Joseph Thomas Murphy (Murphy, Joseph)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Braeseke, McCoy, Mendoza by Danielle Mikhail (Mikhail, Danielle)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by U.S. Marshals as to Mendoza waiver sent on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (bg, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by U.S. Marshals as to McCoy waiver sent on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (bg, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by U.S Marshals as to Braeseke waiver sent on 6/6/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (bg, )
April 22, 2019 SUMMONS Issued, certified copy of order dated 04/22/2019 to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service as to defendants Braeseke, McCoy, Mendoza via email. (aee, )
April 22, 2019 MAILED Copy of Order dated 4/22/19, five blank USM-285 service forms, a magistrate judge consent form, and filing instructions to Plaintiff. (aee, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT filed by Christopher R Price; Jury Demand. (Envelope postmarked 4/11/19) (aee, )
April 22, 2019 EMAILED order dated 04/22/2019, #5 to Supervisor of the Inmate Trust Fund Accounts at Cook County Jail. (aee, )
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The trust fund officer at the Cook County Jail is authorized to deduct $5.76 from Plaintiff's account as the initial partial payment of the filing fee and to continue making deductions in accordance with this order. The Court directs the Clerk to: (1) send a copy of this order electronically to the Supervisor of Inmate Trust Fund Accounts at the Cook County Jail; (2) file Plaintiff's complaint #1 ; (3) dismiss the unknown officer first shift Defendant; (4) issue summonses for service of the complaint on Defendants McCoy, Braeseke, and Mendoza; and (5) send Plaintiff five blank USM-285 service forms, a magistrate judge consent form, filing instructions, and a copy of this order. Plaintiff must return the completed USM-285 service forms to the Clerk in care of the Prisoner Correspondent. The Marshal is appointed to effect service and is authorized to send a request for waiver of service in the manner prescribed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d) before attempting personal service. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 4/22/2019. Mailed notice (aee, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Christopher R Price for attorney representation (bg, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Christopher R Price for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (bg, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (bg, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 4 copies by Christopher R Price (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Envelope postmarked 4/11/2019) (bg, ) Modified on 4/16/2019 (bg, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. McCoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Braeseke
Represented By: Danielle Mikhail
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mendoza
Represented By: Danielle Mikhail
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCoy
Represented By: Danielle Mikhail
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown officer first shift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher R Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?