Stapleton v. Medical Staff et al

Plaintiff: Gregory Stapleton
Defendant: Major Bondage, Correct Care Solutions, P Burns, Entire NRC Staff of Stateville and Medical Staff
Case Number: 1:2019cv02562
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Gregory Stapleton of Change of Address (Envelope postmarked 6/19/2019) (las, )
May 23, 2019 MAILED copy of Order dated 5/23/19 w/IFP Application to Gregory Stapleton - Dixon Correctional. (gcy, ) Text Modified on 5/24/2019 (gcy, ).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court construes Plaintiff's "prison trust fund account statement" #3 as an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and denies it without prejudice. Plaintiff is directed to either (1) submit a renewed application, in accordance with this order; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Failure to comply with this order by June 28, 2019 will result in summary dismissal of this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. The Court defers ruling on Plaintiffs complaint #1 until after his fee status is resolved. Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 5/22/2019. Mailed notice.(gcy, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER Trust Fund Account Statement by Gregory Stapleton. (gcy, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Gregory Stapleton. (Attachments). (Envelope Postmark date 4/8/19). (gcy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stapleton v. Medical Staff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Bondage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entire NRC Staff of Stateville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Stapleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?