Green v. List et al

Plaintiff: Tarrell Green
Defendant: Detective List, Unknown Officer and Crt Officer Ranson
Case Number: 1:2019cv02565
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 MAILED plaintiff copy of order dated 7/8/19 #5 an amended complaint form, a blank USM-285 form, and instructions. Additionally mailed copy of order #5 to the trust fund officer of the facility having custody of Plaintiff. (tt, )
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. For the reasons stated in the Order, Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. The Court authorizes and orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to deduct $41.75 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee, and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this order to the trust fund officer of the facility having custody of Plaintiff. But summonses shall not issue at this time. Plaintiff's complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this lawsuit, he must submit an amended complaint that complies with this order. Failure to submit an amended complaint by 08/07/2019, will result in summary dismissal of this lawsuit. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. If Plaintiff fails to keep the Court informed of his address, then this action will be subject to dismissal for failure to comply with a Court order and for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff an amended complaint form, a blank USM-285 form, and instructions along with a copy of this order. To track the case only (no appearance is required), a status hearing is set for 08/16/2019 at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice(slb, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Tarrell Green for attorney representation (pk, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pk, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Tarrell Green for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (pk, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Tarrell Green. (Exhibit) (Attachments: #1 Envelope not postmarked)(pk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. List et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarrell Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective List
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crt Officer Ranson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?