People Of The State Of Illinois v. Palmer et al
Plaintiff: People Of The State Of Illinois
Defendant: Rondell Jon Palmer
Case Number: 1:2019cv02569
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 REMAND with certified copy of order dated 5/22/2019 and letter to Thirteenth Judicial Circuit LaSalle County(rp, )
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: On the Court's own motion, this case is summarily remanded to the LaSalle County Circuit Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ' 1455(b)(4). All pending motions are denied as moot. The case is terminated on this Courts docket. Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 5/22/2019. Mailed notice (rp, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Rondell Jon Palmer. (Exhibits) (Envelope post marked 4/22/2019) (rp, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Defendant Rondell Jon Palmer for attorney representation (ek, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Defendant Rondell Jon Palmer for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (ek, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (ek, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Rondell Jon Palmer (Exhibits) (Attachments: #1 Envelope not postmarked)(ek, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People Of The State Of Illinois v. Palmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People Of The State Of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rondell Jon Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?