Anti-Age Technologies, LLC v. Partnerships and Unincorporated Association Identified on Schedule "A"

Plaintiff: Anti-Age Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Partnerships and Unincorporated Association Identified on Schedule "A", Doe #197, Doe #203, Doe #64, Doe #454, Doe #73, Doe #151, Doe #126, Doe #329, Doe #281 and Doe #84
Case Number: 1:2019cv02581
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Anti-Age Technologies, LLC of Certain Does (Gulbransen, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 33 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/18/2019. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, the motion for preliminary injunction #27 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Anti-Age Technologies, LLC (Gulbransen, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anti-Age Technologies, LLC as to Partnerships and Unincorporated Association Identified on Schedule "A" on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Gulbransen, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by David Lee Gulbransen, Jr for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #27 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/18/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Gulbransen, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM by Anti-Age Technologies, LLC in support of motion for preliminary injunction #27 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David Gulbransen, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of David Gulbransen)(Gulbransen, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION by Plaintiff Anti-Age Technologies, LLC for preliminary injunction (Gulbransen, David)
June 4, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time #24 is granted, and the temporary restraining order is extended to 6/18/19. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 25 SURETY BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Anti-Age Technologies, LLC. (Document not scanned) (tt, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION by Plaintiff Anti-Age Technologies, LLC for extension of time (Gulbransen, David)
May 29, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant MYQYJ Store and all other Defendants identified in the Complaint (mc, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 23 SEALED Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 5/20/2019: Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order #11 is granted. Plaintiff is directed to submit a proposed temporary restraining order to proposed_order_shah@ilnd.uscourts.gov. Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 21 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anti-Age Technologies, LLC Second Supplemental Declaration of David Gulbransen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Second Supplemental Declaration of David Gulbransen, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Second Supplemental Declaration of David Gulbransen, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Second Supplemental Declaration of David Gulbransen, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Second Supplemental Declaration of David Gulbransen, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Second Supplemental Declaration of David Gulbransen, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Second Supplemental Declaration of David Gulbransen)(Gulbransen, David)
May 15, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Anti-Age Technologies, LLC of Certain Doe Defendants (Gulbransen, David)
May 15, 2019 Filing 19 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anti-Age Technologies, LLC Corrected Ex. 1 to Declaration of David Gulbransen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 of 18, #2 Exhibit Part 2 of 18, #3 Exhibit Part 3 of 18, #4 Exhibit Part 4 of 18, #5 Exhibit Part 5 of 18, #6 Exhibit Part 6 of 18, #7 Exhibit Part 7 of 18, #8 Exhibit Part 8 of 18, #9 Exhibit Part 9 of 18, #10 Exhibit Part 10 of 18, #11 Exhibit Part 11 of 18, #12 Exhibit Part 12 of 18, #13 Exhibit Part 13 of 18, #14 Exhibit Part 14 of 18, #15 Exhibit Part 15 of 18, #16 Exhibit Part 16 of 18, #17 Exhibit Part 17 of 18, #18 Exhibit Part 18 of 18)(Gulbransen, David)
May 1, 2019 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 04/25/19 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Order Number: 34539. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway, 312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2019. (Conway, Colleen)
April 25, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Motion hearing held. The motions for leave to file excess pages #13 and for leave to file under seal #15 are granted. Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order #11 is entered and continued. By 5/16/19, plaintiff shall file a supplement with additional evidence that supports the assertions of jurisdiction and joinder of all defendants, and shall file a corrected Exhibit 1 to the declaration of David Gulbransen #14 , on the court's docket. Continued status hearing 5/17/19 at 9:45 a.m. Notices mailed. notice (psm, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by David Lee Gulbransen, Jr for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order #11 , motion for leave to file excess pages #13 , motion to seal document #15 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 4/25/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Gulbransen, David)
April 22, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff Anti-Age Technologies, LLC to seal document sealed document #14 , sealed document #10 (Gulbransen, David)
April 22, 2019 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anti-Age Technologies, LLC Exhibit 1 to Declaration of David Gulbransen (Gulbransen, David)
April 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Anti-Age Technologies, LLC for leave to file excess pages (Gulbransen, David)
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Anti-Age Technologies, LLC in support of motion for temporary restraining order #11 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kelli Serrault, #2 Declaration Declaration of David Gulbransen, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of David Gulbransen)(Gulbransen, David)
April 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Anti-Age Technologies, LLC for temporary restraining order (Gulbransen, David)
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Anti-Age Technologies, LLC Schedule A to Complaint (Gulbransen, David)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anti-Age Technologies, LLC by Dustin S. Fisher (Fisher, Dustin)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ew, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (ew, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (ew, )
April 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anti-Age Technologies, LLC by David Lee Gulbransen, Jr (Gulbransen, David)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure by Anti-Age Technologies, LLC (Gulbransen, David)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 USPTO Cover Sheet by Anti-Age Technologies, LLC (Gulbransen, David)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gulbransen, David)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Anti-Age Technologies, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15724865. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Gulbransen, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anti-Age Technologies, LLC v. Partnerships and Unincorporated Association Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anti-Age Technologies, LLC
Represented By: David Lee Gulbransen, Jr
Represented By: Dustin S. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partnerships and Unincorporated Association Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe #197
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe #203
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe #64
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe #454
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe #73
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe #151
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe #126
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe #329
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe #281
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe #84
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?