Hunt v. Partnerships and Unincorporated Association Identified on Schedule "A"

Plaintiff: Dale Hunt
Defendant: Partnerships and Unincorporated Association Identified on Schedule "A"
Case Number: 1:2019cv02583
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dale Hunt of Certain Does (Gulbransen, David)
June 24, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dale Hunt of Certain Does (Gulbransen, David)
June 13, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dale Hunt of Certain Doe Defendants (Gulbransen, David)
May 23, 2019 Filing 28 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 5/23/2019.Mailed notice(las, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for preliminary injunction #24 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, May 24, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Motion by David Lee Gulbransen, Jr for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #24 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 5/24/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Gulbransen, David)
May 21, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by Dale Hunt in support of motion for preliminary injunction #24 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David Gulbransen, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of David Gulbransen)(Gulbransen, David)
May 21, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION by Plaintiff Dale Hunt for preliminary injunction (Gulbransen, David)
May 21, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Dale Hunt (Gulbransen, David)
May 21, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dale Hunt as to Partnerships and Unincorporated Association Identified on Schedule "A" on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. (Gulbransen, David)
May 16, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle:Motion for extension of temporary restraining order #19 is granted. Mailed notice (ewf, )
May 13, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Partnerships and Unincorporated Association Identified on Schedule "A" (lma, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by David Lee Gulbransen, Jr for presentment of extension of time #19 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 5/17/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Gulbransen, David)
May 13, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Dale Hunt for extension of time (Gulbransen, David)
May 8, 2019 Filing 18 CIVIL BOND in the amount of $ 10,000 posted by Dale Hunt dba TacoProper Company(Document not scanned). (las, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for temporary restraining order #10 is granted. Motion for leave to file excess pages #11 is granted. Motion to temporarily seal seal documents #14 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, April 26, 2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
April 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by David Lee Gulbransen, Jr for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #11 , motion for temporary restraining order #10 , motion to seal document #14 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 4/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Gulbransen, David)
April 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Dale Hunt to seal document sealed document #13 , sealed document #9 (Gulbransen, David)
April 21, 2019 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Dale Hunt Exhibit 1 to Declaration of David Gulbransen (Gulbransen, David)
April 21, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Dale Hunt in support of motion for temporary restraining order #10 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Dale Hunt, #2 Declaration Declaration of David Gulbransen, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of David Gulbransen)(Gulbransen, David)
April 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Dale Hunt for leave to file excess pages (Gulbransen, David)
April 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Dale Hunt for temporary restraining order (Gulbransen, David)
April 21, 2019 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Dale Hunt Complaint - Schedule A (Gulbransen, David)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dale Hunt by Dustin S. Fisher (Fisher, Dustin)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (las, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 E-MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 exhibit)(las, )
April 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dale Hunt by David Lee Gulbransen, Jr (Gulbransen, David)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 USPTO Cover Sheet by Dale Hunt (Gulbransen, David)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure by Dale Hunt (Gulbransen, David)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gulbransen, David)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dale Hunt; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15725038. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Gulbransen, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Partnerships and Unincorporated Association Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Hunt
Represented By: David Lee Gulbransen, Jr
Represented By: Dustin S. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partnerships and Unincorporated Association Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?