Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union No. 28 Welfare Fund v. AbbVie, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union No. 28 Welfare Fund
Defendant: Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Mylan Inc., Amgen Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd, AbbVie, Inc., AbbVie Biotechnology Ltd and Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02674
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Referring Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: This case has been consolidated into Case No. 19-cv-1873 for all further purposes and is administratively closed. Any future filings shall be made in Case No. 19-cv-1873. Notices mailed. (psm, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: In view of the reassignment of this case to Judge Shah, the status hearing set before Judge Dow on 6/4/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union No. 28 Welfare Fund by Arthur L. Shingler, III (Shingler, Arthur)
May 21, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union No. 28 Welfare Fund by Brian O O'Mara (O'Mara, Brian)
May 10, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union No. 28 Welfare Fund as to Sandoz, Inc. on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Mitchell, David)
May 10, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union No. 28 Welfare Fund as to Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Mitchell, David)
May 10, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union No. 28 Welfare Fund as to Mylan Inc. on 4/23/2019, answer due 5/14/2019. (Mitchell, David)
May 2, 2019 Filing 13 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Manish S. Shah for all further proceedings. Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/2/2019. (ew, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AbbVie Biotechnology Ltd, AbbVie, Inc. by Diana M. Watral (Watral, Diana)
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants AbbVie Biotechnology Ltd, AbbVie, Inc. by James F. Hurst (Hurst, James)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union No. 28 Welfare Fund as to Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Mitchell, David)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union No. 28 Welfare Fund as to Pfizer, Inc. on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Mitchell, David)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union No. 28 Welfare Fund as to Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Mitchell, David)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union No. 28 Welfare Fund as to Amgen Inc. on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Mitchell, David)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union No. 28 Welfare Fund as to AbbVie, Inc. on 4/24/2019, answer due 5/15/2019. (Mitchell, David)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 6/4/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union No. 28 Welfare Fund by David W. Mitchell (Mitchell, David)
April 22, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants AbbVie Biotechnology Ltd, AbbVie, Inc., Amgen Inc., Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC, Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd, Sandoz, Inc. (yt)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mc, )
April 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SHEET METAL WORKERS' LOCAL UNION NO. 28 WELFARE FUND, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated by Peter J. Flowers (Flowers, Peter)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION filed by SHEET METAL WORKERS' LOCAL UNION NO. 28 WELFARE FUND, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated; 75,000. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15739957. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flowers, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union No. 28 Welfare Fund v. AbbVie, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amgen Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Bioepis Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie, Inc.
Represented By: Diana M. Watral
Represented By: James F. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Biotechnology Ltd
Represented By: Diana M. Watral
Represented By: James F. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius Kabi USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union No. 28 Welfare Fund
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Represented By: Peter J. Flowers
Represented By: Arthur L. Shingler, III
Represented By: Brian O O'Mara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?