U.S. Bank, National Association v. Bey
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, National Association
Defendant: Nazir Jabali Bey
Case Number: 1:2019cv02704
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Nazir Jabali Bey for presentment of extension of time #12 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 7/11/2019 at 09:00 AM. (pk, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 FIRST MOTION by Defendant Nazir Jabali Bey for extension of time, Notice. (pk, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion hearing held and continued to 7/10/19 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant reported that he had not received a copy of plaintiff's motion to remand #9 prior to today's hearing. The motion was tendered to the defendant in open court. Defendant must be prepared to respond to the remand motion at the next hearing and to provide the needed supplemental information in support of his petition for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Mailed notice (air, )
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Scott Thomas Zale for presentment of motion to remand #9 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 6/11/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Zale, Scott)
May 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff U.S. Bank, National Association to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Zale, Scott)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff U.S. Bank, National Association by Scott Thomas Zale (Zale, Scott)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion hearing held. Plaintiff not present and docket does not reflect an address for Plaintiff, so notice of this hearing was evidently not provided to the Plaintiff. Defendant is to supplement the Notice of Removal with a copy of the state court complaint. Defendant is also to supplement the In Forma Pauperis Petition #4 with income information as directed in open court. A further status hearing will be set once the required documents have been submitted. Mailed notice (air, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:This case is set for a status hearing on 5/9/19 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is taken under advisement and will be addressed at the status hearing. Mailed notice (air, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lf, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Defendant Nazir Jabali Bey for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (lf, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Nazir Jabali Bey (lf, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (lf, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Circuit Court Chancery Division, case number 17CH06230 filed by defendant Nazir Jabali Bey (Exhibits). (lf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, National Association v. Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nazir Jabali Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, National Association
Represented By: Scott Thomas Zale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?