Caracci v. American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jay Caracci
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. and American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02796
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion to appear pro hac vice #24 is granted. Mailed notice (reg)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Honda Motor Company, Inc. by Mark D. Campbell (Campbell, Mark)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15975183. (Campbell, Mark)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM by Jay Caracci in Opposition to motion to transfer case,, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Bardo, Stacy)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion for leave to file excess pages #20 is granted. Mailed notice (reg)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Stacy Michelle Bardo for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, #20 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 6/21/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Bardo, Stacy)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiff Jay Caracci for leave to file excess pages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Response to Defendant American Honda Motor Company, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer and/or Dismiss (Proposed Enlarged))(Bardo, Stacy)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file his response to defendant's motion to transfer and/or dismiss #17 is granted. The court extends the briefing schedule on Defendant's motion to transfer this action to the Central District of California pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and/or motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 9(b), and 12(b)(6) #11 as follows: Plaintiff to respond by 6/17/2019. Defendant to reply by 7/15/2019. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo is reset for 8/19/2019 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance required on 6/7/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Stacy Michelle Bardo for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #17 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 6/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Bardo, Stacy)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION by Plaintiff Jay Caracci for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to transfer case,, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #11 (Unopposed) (Bardo, Stacy)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: At the parties request and by agreement, the court extends the briefing schedule on Defendant's motion to transfer this action to the Central District of California pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and/or motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 9(b), and 12(b)(6) #11 as follows: Plaintiff to respond by 5/31/2019. Defendant to reply by 6/28/2019. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo is reset for 8/2/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendant's motion to transfer this action to the Central District of California pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and/or motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8, 9(b), and 12(b)(6) #11 as follows: Plaintiff to respond by 5/29/2019. Defendant to reply by 6/12/2019. Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/17/2019 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance required on 5/8/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Michael L. Mallow for presentment of motion to transfer case,, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #11 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 5/8/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Mallow, Michael)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLARATION of ANTHONY OBORNY regarding motion to transfer case,, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #11 (Mallow, Michael)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by American Honda Motor Company, Inc. in support of motion to transfer case,, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(Mallow, Michael)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant American Honda Motor Company, Inc. to transfer case to Central District of California pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) and/or, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant American Honda Motor Company, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 8, 9(b), and 12(b)(6) (Mallow, Michael)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel of record. (smm, )
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jay Caracci by Stacy Michelle Bardo (Bardo, Stacy)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jay Caracci by Larry Paul Smith (Smith, Larry)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. by Michael L. Mallow (Mallow, Michael)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. by Erika Anne Dirk (Dirk, Erika)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Mendoza, Riley)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. by Riley C. Mendoza (Mendoza, Riley)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mendoza, Riley)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2018 CH 14349) filed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15759290. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Mendoza, Riley)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caracci v. American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Mallow
Represented By: Erika Anne Dirk
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. Mallow
Represented By: Erika Anne Dirk
Represented By: Riley C. Mendoza
Represented By: Mark D. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Caracci
Represented By: Stacy Michelle Bardo
Represented By: Larry Paul Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?